Century Aluminum Company et al v. AGCS Marine Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Century Aluminum Company and Nordural EHF
Defendant: AGCS Marine Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02514
Filed: May 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/2/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER re DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE 121 , 181 , 240 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 09/19/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 220 Motion FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DATED AUGUST 23, 2012 ; denying 226 Motion FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DATED AUG UST 28, 2012 ; denying 236 Motion FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DATED AUGUST 30, 2012. The Court refers AGCS back to Judge Cousins to address the issue of notification to non-parties. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER STRIKING 231 Letter Brief filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Co., for failure to meet and confer. (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Order denying 225 Stipulation entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins.
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER re 210 , 214 , 215 Supplemental Depositions and Further Discovery Responses. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 08/30/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING 129 , 181 Century's Motion to Compel Production of Robb Documents re Weather Conditions. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 08/28/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 180 MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 08/23/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER re 180 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 08/21/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of Opposition (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 118 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Limited Portions of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Motion for Leave to Take Additional Depositions 107 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 06/14/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER re Discovery Dispute 96 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 05/03/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re Discovery Disputes 65 , 84 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/04/12. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RE SEARCH AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/13/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re 81 Discovery letter concerning Ute von Briel deposition. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 03/12/12. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REGARDING AGCS MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 72 Motion without prejudice. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING 66 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 02/24/12. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 57 Joint Discovery Letter filed by Nordural EHF, Century Aluminum Company, concerning Ute von Briel deposition and "other claims" discovery. (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying 59 60 62 Letter Brief Requests for Failure to Meet and Confer. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on February 7, 2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE 53 54 . Telephonic Status Hearing set for 1/31/2012 11:00 AM. Parties shall contact Lili Harrell at 415.522.2039 to confirm participation in the conference. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/25/2012. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REGARDING SELECTION OF MEDIATOR. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/23/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re Discovery Status Conference 42 , 43 , 44 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on January 17, 2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/06/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 1/6/2012 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/3/2012. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/14/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Century Aluminum Company et al v. AGCS Marine Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Century Aluminum Company
Represented By: Douglas Edward Roberts
Represented By: Martin Howard Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nordural EHF
Represented By: Martin Howard Myers
Represented By: Douglas Edward Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGCS Marine Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?