Boy Racer, Inc v. Does Featured Case
Plaintiff: Boy Racer, Inc
Defendant: 1-73 Does
Case Number: 3:2011cv02534
Filed: May 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Boy Racer, Inc (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
November 12, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE by Boy Racer, Inc Plaintiff's Notice of Firm Name Change (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 11/12/2011)
November 2, 2011 Filing 27 RESPONSE to re 25 Order Response of Plaintiff to Order to Show Cause by Boy Racer, Inc. (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/14/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/14/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to a Certain Anonymous Doe Defendant by Boy Racer, Inc (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO TWO ANONYMOUS DOE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Action Without Prejudice as to Two Anonymous Doe Defendants; [PROPOSED] ORDER by Boy Racer, Inc (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/9/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 18 Proposed Order re 17 MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief for Leave to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Boy Racer, Inc. (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief for Leave to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Boy Racer, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Gibbs Declaration)(Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE by Boy Racer, Inc Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Certain Anonymous Doe Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of IP Addresses Associated with Anonymous Inidividuals to be Dismissed)(Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
July 23, 2011 Filing 15 RESPONSE (re 12 MOTION to Quash, 10 MOTION to Quash ) Omnibus Response of Plaintiff Boy Racer, Inc. In Opposition to Movants' Motions to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed byBoy Racer, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Does Motions to Quash/Modify Subpoena (Doc. Nos. 10 and 12))(Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 7/23/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/20/11. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 18, 2011 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by John Doe. Responses due by 7/29/2011. Replies due by 8/5/2011. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Quash filed by John Doe. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 8 Stipulation filed by Boy Racer, Inc. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/8/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 8 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Boy Racer, Inc. (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 5 Ex Parte Application for immediate discovery (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 6 Proposed Order re 5 Ex Parte Application For, and Memorandum of Law in Support of, Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference Ex Parte Application For, and Memorandum of Law in Support of, Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Boy Racer, Inc. (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 5 Ex Parte Application For, and Memorandum of Law in Support of, Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Boy Racer, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Hansmeier Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Gibbs Declaration)(Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Boy Racer, Inc.. (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/25/11. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Boy Racer, Inc re 1 Complaint (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /no process against 1-73 Does ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611060236.). Filed byBoy Racer, Inc. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boy Racer, Inc v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boy Racer, Inc
Represented By: Brett Langdon Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-73 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?