Garvey v. Kmart Corporation
Plaintiff: Lisa Garvey, Sabrina Cline and Collette Delbridge
Defendant: Sears Holding Management Corporation and Kmart Corporation
Amicus Curiae: CA Labor Commissione Julie A Su
Not Classified By Court: Pan Oston Holding Company and Winston & Strawn LLP
Case Number: 3:2011cv02575
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2016 Filing 448 CLERK'S NOTICE In accordance with Local Rule 79-4(b), it is requested that counsel withdraw their exhibits by filing a written notice forthwith. If notice is not received within thirty (30) days, the exhibits will be disposed of in accordance with Local Rule 79-4(c). (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
August 18, 2015 Filing 447 Trial Exhibit Location, Exs 2 and 216A. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 5, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 445 Proposed Order re #444 Order Further Submission Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification by Sabrina Cline, Collette Delbridge, Lisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 444 REQUEST RE CY PRES. Response due October 28 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 21, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 443 Renotice motion hearing re #442 MOTION re Amended Notice of Ps' Motion for Certification filed bySabrina Cline, Collette Delbridge, Lisa Garvey. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/4/2014. Replies due by 11/11/2014. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #442 ) (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 442 MOTION for Certification Following Final Approval and Request for Release of Cost Reimbursements. by Sabrina Cline, Collette Delbridge, Lisa Garvey (Attachments: #1 Ps' Motion for Certification Following Final Approval and Request for Release of Cost Reimbursements, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/21/2014) Modified on 10/21/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2014 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. Correct event is Motion.Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #442 Notice (Other), filed by Collette Delbridge, Lisa Garvey, Sabrina Cline (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #442 MOTION. Responses due by 11/4/2014. Replies due by 11/11/2014. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 441 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 440 MANDATE of USCA Cases 13-15117, 13-15797, 13-15814 as to #306 Notice of Appeal filed by Lisa Garvey, #307 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Kmart Corporation, #254 Notice of Appeal filed by Lisa Garvey (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND GRANTING IN PART THE MOTION FOR COSTS AND PAYMENT AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup granting #430 Motion for Settlement; granting in part and denying in part #433 Motion for Settlement (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 438 Proposed Order re #430 MOTION for Settlement Joint Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum in Support of Motion [Proposed] Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Entering Final Judgment by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 437 RESPONSE (re #433 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs Motion for Recovery of Litigation Costs and For Award of Enhancements ) Kmart Corporation's Response to Further Declaration of Matthew Righetti Regarding Billing/Invoices in Support of Attorneys' Costs #436 filed byKmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 436 Declaration of Matthew Righetti in Support of #435 Motion Hearing, Further Declaration of Matthew Righetti Regarding Billing/Invoices in Support of Attorneys' Costs filed byCollette Delbridge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Part 2 of 4 of the Further Declaration of Matthew Righetti Regarding Billing/Invoices in Support of Attorneys' Costs, #2 Declaration Part 3 of 4 of the Further Declaration of Matthew Righetti Regarding Billing/Invoices in Support of Attorneys' Costs, #3 Declaration Part 4 of 4 of the Further Declaration of Matthew Righetti Regarding Billing/Invoices in Support of Attorneys' Costs, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Recovery of Litigation Costs and For Award of Enhancements)(Related document(s) #435 ) (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 435 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/9/2014 before William H. Alsup re #433 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs Motion for Recovery of Litigation Costs and For Award of Enhancements filed by Collette Delbridge, #430 MOTION for Settlement Joint Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Kmart Corporation. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/10/2014)
December 27, 2013 Filing 434 Exhibit Location - Trial Exhibits 11/15 - 11/20/2012. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 433 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs Motion for Recovery of Litigation Costs and For Award of Enhancements filed by Collette Delbridge. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 1/3/2014. Replies due by 1/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Righetti in Support of Motion for Litigation Costs, #2 Declaration of Kevin J. McInerney in Support of Motions for Reimbursement Of Case Costs and Enhancements For the Named Plaintiffs, #3 Declaration of Zachariah P. Dostart In Support of Plaintiff's Motionf For Reimbursement of Case Costs and Enhancements For the Named Plaintiffs, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Recovery of Litigation Costs and For Award of Enhancements, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 432 Fourth Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wohl in Compliance with Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 re #430 Joint Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #430 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/9/2013) Modified on 12/10/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2013 Filing 431 Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Righetti in Support re #430 Motion and Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; by Collette Delbridge. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 12/6/2013) Modified on 12/9/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2013 Filing 430 MOTION for Settlement Joint Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Kmart Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/11/2013. Replies due by 12/18/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Righetti, #2 Proposed Order)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER RE ERRATA by Hon. William Alsup granting #425 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 7, 2013 Filing 428 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wohl in Support of #425 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re: Errata to Parties' Class Action Settlement Agreement, #426 Order Third Supplemental Declaration of Compliance With Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #425 , #426 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 7, 2013 Filing 427 Brief Joint Brief on Whether New Notice and Opportunity to Opt Out Should be Provided to Class Members filed byKmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER RE NOTICE OF ERRATA. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 1, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 31, 2013 Filing 425 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re: Errata to Parties' Class Action Settlement Agreement filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 424 Declaration in Support of #423 Order on Motion for Settlement Second Supplemental Declaration of Compliance With Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #423 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND CLASS NOTICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #421 Motion for Settlement.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 422 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wohl in Support of #421 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Administrative Motion to Modify Settlement Agreement and Class Notice filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #421 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 421 Joint MOTION to Modify Settlement Agreement and Class Notice filed by Kmart Corporation. Responses due by 9/23/2013. Replies due by 9/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/9/2013) Modified on 9/9/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATES by Judge Alsup finding as moot #391 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; terminating #397 Discovery Letter Brief; terminating #399 Discovery Letter Brief; terminating #401 Motion to Vacate ; terminating #315 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 419 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Compliance with Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 #418 Order on Motion for Settlement filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #416 , #418 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/27/2013) Modified on 8/28/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT by Judge William Alsup [granting #415 Motion for Settlement]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 417 NOTICE by Kmart Corporation of Errata Regarding Defendant Kmart Corporation's Declaration of Service of CAFA Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised Declaration of Service of CAFA Notice)(Sachs, Brittany) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 416 Declaration in Support of #415 MOTION for Settlement Joint Administrative Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Declaration of Compliance With Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #415 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 415 MOTION for Settlement Joint Administrative Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Kmart Corporation. Responses due by 8/23/2013. Replies due by 8/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wohl, #2 Proposed Order)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 414 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 7/30/2013) re #401 Joint MOTION to Vacate Joint Administrative Motion to Vacate Dates in Light of Settlement filed by Kmart Corporation. (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/30/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE RE FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND PROPOSED FORM OF NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 30, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 29, 2013 Filing 412 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Winston & Strawn LLP RE PRIVILEGE LOG SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO COURT'S JULY 22, 2013 ORDER AND COVER LETTER RE SAME (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 29, 2013 Filing 411 NOTICE by Winston & Strawn LLP re #400 Order OF LODGING PRIVILEGE LOG SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO COURT'S JULY 22, 2013 ORDER AND COVER LETTER RE SAME (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 29, 2013 Filing 410 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Jay Lederman (Lederman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 29, 2013 Filing 409 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista M. Enns (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 29, 2013 Filing 408 ERRATA re #407 Brief Notice of Errata Regarding Defendant Kmart Corporation's Memorandumm in Support of Class Action Settlement by Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 29, 2013 Filing 407 MEMORANDUM in Support of Class Action Settlement filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wohl)(Related document(s)[], #401 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/29/2013) Modified on 7/29/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2013 Filing 406 RESPONSE TO Court's Order Dated July 25, 2013 in Support of Preliminary Approval filed by Collette Delbridge. (Related document(s)[], #405 ) (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 7/29/2013) Modified on 7/29/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2013 ***Deadlines terminated. #405 Order., Set/Reset Hearing re #401 Joint MOTION to Vacate Joint Administrative Motion to Vacate Dates in Light of Settlement. Preliminary Approval and Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER SETTING HEARING SCHEDULE re #403 Order, #401 Joint MOTION to Vacate Joint Administrative Motion to Vacate Dates in Light of Settlement filed by Kmart Corporation, #404 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Kmart Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 25, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Filing 404 RESPONSE to re #403 Order The Parties' Answers to the Questions Posed by the Court Re: Their Settlement by Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 25, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 402 Proposed Order re #401 Joint MOTION to Vacate Joint Administrative Motion to Vacate Dates in Light of Settlement by Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 Filing 401 MOTION to Vacate Dates in Light of Settlement filed by Kmart Corporation. Responses due by 8/7/2013. Replies due by 8/14/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Understanding)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/24/2013) Modified on 7/25/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER RE JULY 17, 2013, DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re #397 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Kmart Corporation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/22/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 19, 2013 Filing 399 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lisa Garvey. (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [Re #397 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Kmart Corporation]. Plaintiff's response due by NOON ON 7/19/2013. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/18/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 17, 2013 Filing 397 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 11, 2013 Filing 396 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kmart Corporation of Proposed Order re Administrative Motion to Seal (Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 11, 2013 Filing 395 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on July 9, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 7/11/2013). Discussions are going. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Hon. William Alsup denying #377 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO ALLOW DEPOSITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting #389 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 Filing 392 NOTICE by Kmart Corporation re #390 Order on Stipulation NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 391 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTION OF DECLARATION OF MICHAEL RIGHETTI REGARDING INVOLVEMENT IN THE DISCOVERY PROCESS PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER (DOCKET 365) (ECF 370) filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wohl ISO Administrative Motion to Seal Portion of Declaration of Righetti, #2 Declaration Declaration of Zachary P. Hutton ISO Administrative Motion to Seal Portion of Declaration of Righetti)(Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST TO SEAL AND GRANTING REQUEST FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part #378 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 2, 2013 Filing 389 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ALLOW TWO EXPERT DEPOSITIONS NOTWITHSTANDING EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF filed by Kmart Corporation. (Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William Alsup [granting #381 Discovery Letter Brief]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 387 RESPONSE (re #377 First MOTION for Leave to File Reconsideration Motion Pursuant to Local Rule 7-9 ) filed byKmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 386 Letter from Jeffrey D. Wohl regarding plaintiff's motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 21, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #385 Order on Motion to Continue, Order on Stipulation. Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/30/2013 07:30 AM and 7/31/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING by Judge Alsup granting #379 Motion to Continue; granting #384 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 384 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #379 Joint MOTION to Continue Evidentiary Hearing filed by Collette Delbridge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 383 Declaration of Emily C. Schuman in Support of #379 Joint MOTION to Continue Evidentiary Hearing filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #379 ) (Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 382 Declaration of Amanda C. Sommerfeld in Support of #379 Joint MOTION to Continue Evidentiary Hearing filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #379 ) (Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 381 Discovery Letter BriefPan-Oston's Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order filed by Pan Oston Holding Company. (Oliveira, Kristin) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 380 Declaration of Aimee Grabau in Support of #379 Joint MOTION to Continue Evidentiary Hearing filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #379 ) (Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 379 Joint MOTION to Continue Evidentiary Hearing filed by Collette Delbridge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Righetti, #2 Declaration of Michael Righetti, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 378 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #365 Order,, Set Hearings, #370 Affidavit Stipulation to Seal Portions of the Declaration of Michael Righetti regarding Involvement in the Discovery Process filed by Kmart Corporation. (Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 377 First MOTION for Leave to File Reconsideration Motion Pursuant to Local Rule 7-9 filed by Collette Delbridge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RECONSIDERATION MOTION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7-9)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 376 Joint Statement in Response re #363 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Certify Class,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/20/2013) Modified on 6/20/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2013 Filing 375 Letter from Jeffrey D. Wohl . (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 374 Letter from Matthew Righetti . (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 373 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 7/9/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/20/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE re #371 Letter filed by Collette Delbridge. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 19, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 18, 2013 Filing 371 Letter from Michael Righetti re date of evidentiary hearing. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 18, 2013 Filing 370 DECLARATION of Michael Righetti re #365 Order,, Set Hearings, by Collette Delbridge. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 6/18/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSIONS. Responses due by noon on 6/20/2013. Replies due by noon on 6/21/2013. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/18/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 368 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin L. Oliveira on behalf of Non-Parties Pan-Oston Holding Company and Pan-Oston Co. (Oliveira, Kristin) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER (Limited Remand) of USCA Case 13-15117 as to #254 Notice of Appeal filed by Lisa Garvey (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 14, 2013 Filing 366 Declaration of Kevin J. McInerney in Response to #365 Order, Set Hearings,, filed by Collette Delbridge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #365 ) (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 6/14/2013) Modified on 6/17/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER REGARDING EVIDENTIARY HEARING -- Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/2/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/3/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2013 Filing 364 Letter Brief filed byPan Oston Holding Company. (Oliveira, Kristin) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 OMNIBUS ORDER GRANTING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE, CERTIFYING CLASS, AND DENYING REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY EXTENSION by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part #309 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #311 Motion to Certify Class; deferring ruling on #315 Motion Rule 60 (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 362 AFFIDAVIT re #357 Notice (Other) Memorandum regarding Electronic Files Lodged with Court by Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 361 Declaration of Amanda C. Sommerfeld in Response to Second Order regarding Rule 60 Motion filed byKmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 360 NOTICE by Lisa Garvey re #356 Order To Move For A Remand Deadline June 12, 2013 (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 359 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 6, 2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2013. (Related documents(s) #354 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 358 NOTICE by Collette Delbridge re #356 Order Notice of Lodging of Electronic Files (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 357 NOTICE by Kmart Corporation re #356 Order Notice of Lodging of Electronic Files (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 SECOND ORDER REGARDING RULE 60 MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 7, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 355 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Michael Righetti Pursuant to Court's Request at the June 6, 2013 Hearing. by Collette Delbridge. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/6/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 354 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Kmart Corporation for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Hutton, Zachary) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 353 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 6/6/2013) re #315 MOTION Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(b) filed by Lisa Garvey, #311 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Collette Delbridge, #309 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kmart Corporation. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 352 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Lisa Garvey for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/19/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 5, 2013 Filing 351 DECLARATION of Kevin McInerney dated June 5, 2013 re Rule 60(b) Motion by Collette Delbridge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL RIGHETTI DATED JUNE 5, 2013 RE RULE 60 (b) MOTION)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 6/5/2013) Modified on 6/6/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2013 Filing 350 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wohl in Response to #341 Order, filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #341 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/5/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2013 Filing 349 Brief re #341 Order, Defendant Kmart Corporation's Memorandum in Response to Court's Order Regarding Rule 60 Motion filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 348 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wohl in Response to #341 Order, filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #341 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/4/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Filing 347 Declaration of Emily Schuman in Response to #341 Order, filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/4/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Filing 346 Declaration of Jim Hamilton in Response to #341 Order, filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Related document(s) #341 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/4/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Filing 345 Declaration of Marisa Pulice in Response to #341 Order, filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/4/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting #342 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 31, 2013 Filing 343 NOTICE of Appearance of Zachary Hutton for Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/31/2013) Modified on 5/31/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 Filing 342 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Re: Depositions; [Proposed] Order filed by Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER REGARDING RULE 60 MOTION re #328 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Kmart Corporation, #315 MOTION Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(b) filed by Lisa Garvey. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 28, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 340 REPLY (re #315 MOTION Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(b) ) filed byLisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration with Exhibits 28-35, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 339 REPLY (re #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATIONS filed byCollette Delbridge. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 22, 2013 Filing 338 RESPONSE (re #315 MOTION Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(b) ) Clarification to its Opposition to Plaintiff Lisa Garvey's Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(B) filed byKmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 22, 2013 Filing 337 RESPONSE (re #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) Opposition to Plaintiff Colette Delbridge's Objection to and Motion to Strike Kmart's Cashier Declarations in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Wohl in Opposition to Plaintiff's Objection to and Motion to Strike Kmart's Cashier Declarations in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Overruling Plaintiff's Objection to, and Denying her Motion to Strike Kmart's Cashier Declarations in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Grube, E.) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 336 REPLY (re #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byCollette Delbridge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 335 REPLY (re #309 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byKmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 334 Letter from Jeffrey D. Wohl to Hon. William H. Alsup. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 333 Letter from Matthew Righetti to Judge Alsup. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 16, 2013 Filing 332 DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Wohl in Opposition to #315 MOTION Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(b) filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #315 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Filing 331 DECLARATION of Elizabeth J. MacGregor in Opposition to #315 MOTION Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(b) filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #315 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Filing 330 DECLARATION of Jesse Gonzalez in Opposition to #315 MOTION Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(b) filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #315 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Filing 329 DECLARATION of Greg Ebert in Opposition to #315 MOTION Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(b) filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #315 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 Filing 328 RESPONSE (re #315 MOTION Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(b) ) filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 14, 2013 Filing 327 ERRATA re #316 Opposition/Response to Motion, Defendant Kmart Corporation's Errata to Opposition to Plaintiff Collette DelBridge's Motion for Class Certification by Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 14, 2013 Filing 326 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kmart Corporation re #318 Declaration in Opposition, Proof of Service of Manually Filed Exhibit 16 Hard Drive of Video Images (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 325 RESPONSE/Opposition (re #309 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by Collette Delbridge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 5/13/2013) Modified on 5/14/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Filing 324 EXHIBITS re #323 Declaration in Opposition,, filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 205-225, #2 Exhibit 226-243, #3 Exhibit 244-266, #4 Exhibit 267-286, #5 Exhibit 287-306, #6 Exhibit 307-325, #7 Exhibit 326-348, #8 Exhibit 349-371, #9 Exhibit 372-388, #10 Exhibit 389-400)(Related document(s) #323 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 323 DECLARATION of Coompendium of Cashier Declarations Collected from December 2012 to April 2013 in Opposition to #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11, #2 Exhibit 12-33, #3 Exhibit 34-52, #4 Exhibit 53-67, #5 Exhibit 68-92, #6 Exhibit 93-106, #7 Exhibit 107-128, #8 Exhibit 129-149, #9 Exhibit 150-167, #10 Exhibit 168-186, #11 Exhibit 187-204)(Related document(s) #311 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 322 DECLARATION of Compendium of Day in the Life Declarations in Opposition to #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #311 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 321 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Wohl in Opposition to #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H and I)(Related document(s) #311 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 320 DECLARATION of Sonya Kwon in Opposition to #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #311 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 319 DECLARATION of Jesse Gonzalez in Opposition to #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #311 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 318 DECLARATION of Dr. Jeffrey E. Fernandez in Opposition to #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15, #2 Exhibit 16 - Manually Filed Hard Drive Containing Video Images)(Related document(s) #311 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 317 DECLARATION of Greg Ebert in Opposition to #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #311 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 316 RESPONSE (re #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 315 MOTION Relief from Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(b) filed by Lisa Garvey. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/16/2013. Replies due by 5/23/2013. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1-8, #4 9-18, #5 19-27, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 1, 2013 Filing 314 USCA 9th Circuit Case Number 13-15814 for #307 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Kmart Corporation. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 Filing 313 USCA 9th Circuit Case Number 13-15797 for #306 Notice of Appeal filed by Lisa Garvey. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 29, 2013 Filing 312 Proposed Order re #309 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 29, 2013 Filing 311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Collette Delbridge. Responses due by 5/13/2013. Replies due by 5/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION part 1 of 2, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION part 2 of 2)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 29, 2013 Filing 310 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wohl in Support of #309 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #309 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 29, 2013 Filing 309 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kmart Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/13/2013. Replies due by 5/20/2013. (Attachments: # Posted in Error, See Entry #312 (1) Proposed Order)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/29/2013) Modified on 4/29/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #311 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 308 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #306 Notice of Appeal, #307 Notice of Cross Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Docket)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 23, 2013 Filing 307 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to #283 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Kmart Corporation. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0971-7649573. Appeal Record due by 5/23/2013. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 306 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Lisa Garvey.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-7646285 paid.) Appeal from Order on Parties' Motion Regarding Taxable Costs (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 305 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Kmart's Answer to Plaintiffs' Cline and DelBridge's (Corrected #293 ) Amended Class Action Complaint byKmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION OF JEFF BECKMAN. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 11, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 11, 2013 Filing 303 Letter from Jeffrey D. Wohl . (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 11, 2013 Filing 302 Letter from Matthew Righetti to Judge Alsup. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 11, 2013 Filing 301 Letter from Jeffrey D. Wohl . (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 10, 2013 Filing 300 Letter from Matthew Righetti to Judge Alsup. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 299 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 4/4/2013 before Judge Willia Alsup (Date Filed: 4/4/2013). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 298 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/04/2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2013. (Related documents(s) #296 , #297 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 297 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Kmart Corporation for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Michalowski, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 296 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Lisa Garvey for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 3, 2013 Filing 295 Letter from Matthew Righetti to Judge Alsup. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO REPLACE COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting #293 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 293 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Sabrina Cline, Collette Delbridge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER MOVING DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re #290 Letter filed by Kmart Corporation]. 4-Hour Meet-and-Confer on 4/4/2013 from 8:30 a.m.--12:30 p.m. in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 4/4/2013 sometime between 12:30--02:30 PM (as calendar permits) in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/29/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 291 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kmart Corporation. Filed bySabrina Cline, Collette Delbridge. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 290 Letter from Jeffrey D. Wohl regarding discovery disputes. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND TO ADD NEW PLAINTIFFS AND TO ALLOW INTERVENTION AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting #269 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER MOVING DISCOVERY HEARING AND MEET-AND-CONFER. Response due by noon on 3/29/2013. 3-1/2 hour meet-and-confer starting at 9:30 a.m.--1:30 p.m. (with half-hour at noon for lunch) on 4/3/2013 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 4/3/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/28/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 28, 2013 Filing 287 Letter Brief re #286 Letter, #285 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #286 , #285 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 27, 2013 Filing 286 Letter from Matthew Righetti re Discovery Disputes. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re #284 Letter filed by Lisa Garvey]. Response due by noon on 3/29/2013. 3-1/2 Hour Meet-and-Confer starting 10:00 a.m.--2:00 p.m. (1/2 hour for lunch at noon) 4/1/2013 in Attorney's Lounge on 18th floor of San Francisco courthouse. Discovery Hearing set for 4/1/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/27/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 26, 2013 Filing 284 Letter from Michael Righetti re Discovery Disputes. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER ON PARTIES MOTIONS REGARDING TAXABLE COSTS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part #273 Motion to Strike ; denying #277 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013) Modified on 3/27/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2013 Filing 282 Proposed Order re #273 MOTION to Strike #272 Costs Taxed Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Costs Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Costs by Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 25, 2013 Filing 281 DECLARATION of Amanda C. Sommerfeld in Opposition to #273 MOTION to Strike #272 Costs Taxed Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Costs filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #273 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 25, 2013 Filing 280 RESPONSE (re #273 MOTION to Strike #272 Costs Taxed Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Costs ) filed byKmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 22, 2013 Filing 279 RESPONSE to re #276 Order Plaintiff's Submission in Response to Docket No. 276 Requiring Further Sworn Statement From Counsel and Plaintiff by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 278 REPLY (re #269 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO AMEND TO ADD NEW PLAINTIFFS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ALLOW INTERVENTION BY PLAINTIFF INTERVENORS ) filed byLisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 277 MOTION Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs re #272 Costs Taxed filed by Kmart Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 3/27/2013. Replies due by 4/3/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Amanda C. Sommerfeld in Support of Defendant Kmart Corporation's Motion for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Kmart Corporation's Motion for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 276 REQUEST FOR FURTHER SWORN STATEMENT REGARDING COST MOTION re #273 MOTION to Strike #272 Costs Taxed Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Costs filed by Lisa Garvey, #272 Costs Taxed (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 275 RESPONSE (re #269 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO AMEND TO ADD NEW PLAINTIFFS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ALLOW INTERVENTION BY PLAINTIFF INTERVENORS ) filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eli Gonzalez, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wohl, #3 Proposed Order)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME re #271 Letter filed by Kmart Corporation, #270 Letter filed by Lisa Garvey (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
March 11, 2013 Filing 273 MOTION to Strike #272 Costs Taxed filed by Lisa Garvey. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 3/25/2013. Replies due by 4/1/2013. (Attachments: #1Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support #2Declaration of Michael Righetti in Support #3 Declaration of Lisa Garvey;(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 3/11/2013) Modified on 3/11/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2013 Filing 272 Costs Taxed in amount of $45,331.19 re ECF No. 249 against Plaintiff. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 271 Letter from Jeffrey D. Wohl . (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 270 Letter from Matthew Righetti to Hon. Alsup Re Motion to Amend. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 269 MOTION to AMEND To Add New Plaintiffs, or in the Alternative, to Allow Intervention by Plaintiff Intervenors. filed by Lisa Garvey. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 3/21/2013. Replies due by 3/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Righetti in Support #2 Notice of Hearing. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 2/27/2013) Modified on 2/27/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/27/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2013 Filing 268 **Note: This transcript was not efiled by July 25, 2012 as required, so it being unlocked upon efiling.** Transcript of Proceedings held on July 18, 2012, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter, Sahar Bartlett, Email: Debra_Campbell@cand.uscourts.gov; telephone number: (415) 522-2079. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013) Modified on 2/19/2013 (djc, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2013 Filing 267 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER GRANTING CHANGE OF COUNSEL re #261 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Kmart Corporation, #262 Proposed Order filed by Kmart Corporation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
February 4, 2013 Filing 265 AMENDED Minute Entry: Post Trial Status Conference (Date Filed: 2/4/2013)Correcting deadline for leave to add new parties or pleading amendments, correct date is 2/27/2013. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/4/2013)
January 28, 2013 Filing 264 USCA Case Number 13-15117 USCA 9th Circuit for #254 Notice of Appeal filed by Lisa Garvey. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013) Modified on 1/29/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 24, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 24, 2013 Filing 262 Proposed Order re #261 Notice of Change In Counsel by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 24, 2013 Filing 261 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Amanda C. Sommerfeld (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 260 Letter from Jeffrey D. Wohl on Behalf of Plaintiff Lisa Garvey and Defendant Kmart Corporation Regarding Two Pre-trial Dates set by the Court following the January 10, 2013, Case Management Conference and the Trial Date. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/23/2013) Modified on 1/23/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2013 Filing 259 RESPONSE to re #255 Objection, Defendant Kmart Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Bill of Costs by Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 258 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 10, 2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2013. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michalowski, Elizabeth MacGregor and Malaina Freedman on Behalf of KMart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/18/2013) Modified on 1/18/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2013 Filing 256 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Lisa Garvey re #254 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 16, 2013 Filing 255 OBJECTIONS to re #249 Bill of Costs, PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS BILL OF COSTS by Lisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS BILL OF COSTS, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF LISA GARVEY)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 16, 2013 Filing 254 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Lisa Garvey.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-7412803 paid.) (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 15, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magi Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
January 11, 2013 Filing 253 Minute Entry: Post Trial Status Conference - held.(Date Filed: 1/11/2013). Update to initial disclosures due by 1/25/2013Leave to add new parties or pleading amendments due by 2/7/2013Filing deadline for class certification motion: 4/4/2013Non-expert discovery cut-off date: 5/31/2013Designation of expert & disclosure of expert reports: 5/31/2013Dispositive motion filing deadline: 7/11/2013Final Pretrial conference: 9/9/2013 at 2:00 p.m.Bench Trial: 9/23/2013 at 7:30 a.m.Case re-referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOLLOWING BENCH TRIAL: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Mediation/Settlement. Bench Trial set for 9/23/2013 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Motion for further class certification must be filed by 4/4/2013, to be heard on a 35-day track. Discovery due by 5/31/2013. Motions due by 7/11/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/10/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 251 CLERKS NOTICE Status Conference re-set for 1/10/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. William Alsup. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 3, 2013 Filing 250 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Post Trial Case Management Conference Statement filed by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
January 2, 2013 Filing 249 BILL OF COSTS by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda C. Sommerfeld in Support of Defendant Kmart Corporation's Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 28, 2012 Filing 248 Letter from Jeff Wohl of Paul Hastings on behalf of Kmart Corporation . (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 18, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re #246 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. Status Conference set for 1/10/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 247 PARTIAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 54(b). Signed by Judge Alsup on December 18, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2012: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2012 Filing 246 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 18, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2012: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2012 Filing 245 Letter from Lisa Garvey and Kmart Corporation re Doc. 240 Order of 12/11/12. (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 244 RESPONSE to re #238 Amicus Curiae Appearance, #239 Order PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO LABOR COMMISSIONER AMICUS BRIEF by Lisa Garvey. (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 243 Statement re #238 Amicus Curiae Appearance, Defendant Kmart Corporation's Statement Regarding DLSE's Amicus Brief by Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 11, 2012 Filing 241 Letter from Matthew Righetti to Judge Alsup. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER RE VIDEO EVIDENCE (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 11, 2012 Filing 239 NOTICE REQUESTING COMMENTS ON AMICUS BRIEF (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 7, 2012 Filing 238 Amicus Brief of the CA Labor Commissioner on Behalf of the Division of Labor Standards Enforcement and the California Labor and Workforce Development Agency. by Julie A Su. (Villalovos, Robert) (Filed on 12/7/2012) Modified on 12/7/2012 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2012 Filing 237 Proposed Findings of Fact by Lisa Garvey Plaintiff's Responses to Kmart's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Zach P Dostart, #2 Appendix Additional Authorities, #3 Exhibit A- Avilez v. Pinkerton order, #4 Exhibit B- Statement of Findings, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 6, 2012 Filing 236 RESPONSE to re #229 Statement correction of docket #235 by Kmart Corporation. (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 6, 2012 Filing 235 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #236 . *** Proposed Findings of Fact by Kmart Corporation DEFENDANT KMART CORPORATION'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 12/6/2012) Modified on 12/7/2012 (wv, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2012 Filing 234 Proposed Findings of Fact by Kmart Corporation . (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 29, 2012 Filing 233 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa Garvey re #228 Letter, (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 232 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kmart Corporation re #230 Statement, (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 231 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kmart Corporation re #230 Statement, (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 230 Statement Defendant Kmart Corporation's Statement to the LWDA and the DLSE Regarding theAmicus Brief Requested by the Court by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments 1-10, #2 Exhibit Attachments 11-14, #3 Exhibit Attachments 15-19, #4 Exhibit Attachments 20-23)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 229 Statement CONTENTIONS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Lisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 228 Letter from Plaintiff Lisa Garvey re Doc. 210 Order Requesting Amicus Briefs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-8, #3 Exhibit 9-10, #4 Exhibit 11-13, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 15-17)(McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 227 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/20/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2013. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 226 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/19/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2013. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 225 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/16/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2013. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 224 Exhibit List of Admitted Exhibits. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 223 NOTICE REGARDING FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO LOAD MATERIALS re #219 Proposed Order filed by Kmart Corporation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 222 Minute Entry: Bench Trial completed on 11/20/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/20/2012). (Court Reporter Debra Pas; Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 219 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Kmart Corporation Permisson to Load Trial Materials and Equipment From The Court House by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 19, 2012 Filing 221 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 11/19/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/19/2012). (Court Reporter Debra Pas; Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULTION AND ORDER RE ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS by Judge William Alsup granting #216 Stipulation (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 18, 2012 Filing 217 NOTICE by Kmart Corporation of Errata Regarding the Parties' Joint Submission of Wage Order 7-2001 Section 14 Authorities (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/18/2012)
November 18, 2012 Filing 216 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ADMISSION OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS filed by Lisa Garvey, Kmart Corporation. (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/18/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED FORMAT by Hon. William Alsup granting #194 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 16, 2012 Filing 214 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 11/16/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/16/2012). (Court Reporter Debra Pas; Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER REQUESTING AMICUS BRIEFS FROM CALIFORNIA AGENCIES. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 16, 2012. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2012: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2012 Filing 209 NOTICE by Kmart Corporation STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 16, 2012 Filing 208 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/15/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 16, 2012 Filing 207 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/14/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 16, 2012 Filing 206 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/13/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 213 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 11/15/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/15/2012). (Court Reporter Debra Pas; Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 205 Appendix re #201 Trial Brief MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 52(C) filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #201 ) (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 204 Appendix re #202 Trial Brief ORAL MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE CLASS filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #202 ) (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 203 Statement Defendant KMart Corporation's Statement Regarding Amcius Brief Questions by Kmart Corporation. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 202 TRIAL BRIEF ORAL MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE CLASS by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 201 TRIAL BRIEF ORAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 52(C) by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 200 RESPONSE to Proposed Order Requesting Amicus Briefs From California Agencies by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PENALTIES CALCULATIONS by Judge William Alsup granting #195 Stipulation (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 198 Letter from Matthew Righetti to Judge Alsup. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 197 Brief Plaintiff's Submission Regarding Business Judgment filed byLisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 196 NOTICE by Kmart Corporation Defendant KMart Corporation's Memorandum Re: Role of Busienss Judgment in Seats Cases (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 212 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 11/14/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/14/2012). (Court Reporter Debra Pas;Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 195 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PENALTIES CALCULATIONS filed by Lisa Garvey, Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 194 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed by Lisa Garvey, Kmart Corporation. (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 211 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 11/13/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/13/2012). (Court Reporter Debra Pas/Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 192 RESPONSE to re #189 Objection,,,, by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 12, 2012 Filing 193 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 11/12/2012). Case did not settle. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/12/2012)
November 12, 2012 Filing 191 NOTICE by Kmart Corporation Rolling Witness List (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/12/2012)
November 12, 2012 Filing 190 OBJECTIONS to re #189 Objection,,,, Rest of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Further Objection to Demonstrative Exhibits by Lisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rest of Exhibits to Declaration of Matthew Righetti in Support of Plaintiff's Further Objection to Demonstrative Exhibits, Exhibits 2 Thru 5, #2 Exhibit Rest of Exhibits to Declaration of Matthew Righetti in Support of Plaintiff's Further Objection to Demonstrative Exhibits, Exhibit 6 Part 1, #3 Exhibit Rest of Exhibits to Declaration of Matthew Righetti in Support of Plaintiff's Further Objection to Demonstrative Exhibits, Exhibit 6 Part 2, #4 Exhibit Rest of Exhibits to Declaration of Matthew Righetti in Support of Plaintiff's Further Objection to Demonstrative Exhibits, Exhibit 6 Part 3, #5 Exhibit Rest of Exhibits to Declaration of Matthew Righetti in Support of Plaintiff's Further Objection to Demonstrative Exhibits 7 thru 11)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/12/2012)
November 12, 2012 Filing 189 OBJECTIONS to Demonstrative Exhibits and Further Request for Discovery Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37; Request for Consideration of an OSC Under Rule 11 by Lisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 3, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 4, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 5, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 6, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 7, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 8, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 9, #10 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 10, #11 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 11, #12 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 12, #13 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Righetti Exhibit 1 Part 13)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/12/2012)
November 11, 2012 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan B. Tucker Fife (Tucker Fife, Joan) (Filed on 11/11/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER PERMITTING ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 186 Proposed Order Granting K-Mart Corp's Permission to Use Equipment at Trial. by Kmart Corporation. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 8, 2012 Filing 184 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/6/12, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Official Reporter, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2013. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 8, 2012 Filing 183 NOTICE by Kmart Corporation Notice of Association of Co-Counsel for Defendant Kmart Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 8, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re #179 Order Bench Trial set for 11/13/2012 07:30 AM. Bench Trial set for 11/14/2012 07:30 AM. Bench Trial set for 11/15/2012 07:30 AM. Bench Trial set for 11/16/2012 07:30 AM. Bench Trial set for 11/19/2012 07:30 AM. Bench Trial set for 11/20/2012 07:30 AM. Bench Trial set for 11/21/2012 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 6, 2012 Filing 185 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/6/2012) re #146 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Kmart Corporation, Pretrial Conference held on 11/6/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/6/2012). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 182 OMNIBUS ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE by Hon. William Alsup denying #146 Motion to Continue.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER ON MOTION FOR SPOLIATION(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 5, 2012 Filing 178 RESPONSE (re #175 MOTION Decertification re #131 Order ) filed byLisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 5, 2012 Filing 177 RESPONSE to re #176 Letter by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 5, 2012 Filing 176 Letter from Matthew Righetti to Judge Alsup. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 175 MOTION Decertification re #131 Order filed by Kmart Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/16/2012. Replies due by 11/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ben Kimberley, #2 Declaration of Joe Krock, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 174 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Lisa Garvey RE: RICHARD EVANS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DR. RICK EVANS AND EXHIBITS 1 AND 2, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3 TO DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DR. RICK EVANS, #3 Exhibit EXHIBITS 4-7 TO DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DR. RICK EVANS, #4 Exhibit EXHIBITS 8-13 TO DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DR. RICK EVANS, #5 Declaration DECLARATION OF RICHARD EVANS)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 1, 2012 Filing 173 REPLY (re #146 MOTION to Continue Trial Date ) filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental), #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DR. RICK EVANS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 31, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 171 TRIAL BRIEF by Lisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6-10, #3 Exhibit 11-12, #4 Exhibit 13-19)(McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 170 Letter from Amanda C. Sommerfeld (Letter dated October 30, 2012 to Honorable Judge William Alsup with Enclosed Joint [Proposed] Pretrial Order. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 169 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kmart Corporation (Kimberley, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 168 Proposed Findings of Fact by Lisa Garvey Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 167 RESPONSE (re #146 MOTION to Continue Trial Date ) filed byLisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin J. McInerney, #2 Exhibit 1-3 to McInerney Declaration, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 166 Proposed Pretrial Order , Joint by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 165 Proposed Findings of Fact by Kmart Corporation . (Adkins, Robb) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 164 Request for Judicial Notice re #163 Trial Brief filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #163 ) (Adkins, Robb) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 163 TRIAL BRIEF by Kmart Corporation. (Adkins, Robb) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 162 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM COPIES OF PLAINTIFF GARVEYS RULE 26 (A)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES AND PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO KMARTS TRIAL DISCLOSURES; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 161 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM (Rule 26(A)(3) Pretrial Disclosures and Objections) by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 160 MOTION in Limine No. 2 filed by Kmart Corporation. Responses due by 11/13/2012. Replies due by 11/20/2012. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 159 MOTION in Limine No. 1 filed by Kmart Corporation. Responses due by 11/13/2012. Replies due by 11/20/2012. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 158 First MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 Collated with Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 in advance of Pretrial Conference filed by Lisa Garvey. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/24/2012. Replies due by 10/24/2012. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Robb Christopher Adkins (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Adkins, Robb) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 156 ERRATA re #154 Objection To Plaintiff Garvey's Rule 26(A)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 29, 2012 Filing 155 Letter from Amanda C. Sommerfeld . (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 154 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff Garvey's Rule 26(A)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 153 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-8-11, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 25, 2012 Filing 152 NOTICE RE STATEMENT REGARDING JURY DEMAND re #151 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Lisa Garvey. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 25, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 25, 2012 Filing 151 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT RE JURY DEMAND filed by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 25, 2012 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Kimberley (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kimberley, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 24, 2012 Filing 149 REPLY (re #126 First MOTION for Discovery Sanctions For Failure To Comply With The Court's Evidence Preservation Order MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byLisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supp Dec of MR iso P's Reply re Motion for Discovery Sanctions)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER RE JURY DEMAND. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 24, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 23, 2012 Filing 147 Proposed Order re #146 MOTION to Continue Trial Date Amended Proposed Order Granting Defendant Kmart Corporation's Motion for Continuance of The Trial Date by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 23, 2012 Filing 146 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda C. Sommerfeld, #2 Declaration DaveBarbieri, #3 Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 23, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #146 MOTION to Continue Trial Date. Responses due by 10/30/2012. Replies due by 11/1/2012. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 22, 2012 Filing 145 OBJECTIONS to KMARTS TRIAL DISCLOSURES by Lisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO KMARTS TRIAL DISCLOSURES)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER MOVING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE [re #143 Pretrial Conference Statement filed by Kmart Corporation]. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/22/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 22, 2012 Filing 143 Pretrial Conference Statement by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE by Hon. William Alsup re #129 Motion to Shorten Time.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying #125 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 AMENDED ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S LETTER OF OCTOBER 19 [re #139 Order, #138 Letter filed by Kmart Corporation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/19/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S LETTER OF OCTOBER 19 [re #138 Letter filed by Kmart Corporation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/17/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 138 Letter from Amanda C. Sommerfeld (to Honorable William H. Alsup). (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 137 RESPONSE (re #129 MOTION to Shorten Time To File Motion For Continuance Of Trial Date ) filed byLisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin J. McInerney, #2 Exhibit 1-3 to McInerney Declaration, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 136 RESPONSE (re #126 First MOTION for Discovery Sanctions For Failure To Comply With The Court's Evidence Preservation Order MOTION for Sanctions ) (Defendant Kmart Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion Re Discovery Sanctions) filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda C. Sommerfeld, #2 Declaration Greg Ebert, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 135 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT RE STATUS OF THE CLASS, CLASS LIST AND ALL REQUESTS TO OPT OUT OF CLASS filed by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 AMENDED ORDER MOVING MOTIONS AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE [re #132 Order, Set Hearings, #133 Letter filed by Lisa Garvey]. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/17/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 133 Letter from Matthew Righetti to Judge Alsup. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER MOVING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/17/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S LETTER OF OCTOBER 16, 2012 [re #130 Letter filed by Kmart Corporation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012) Modified on 10/16/2012 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2012 Filing 130 Letter from Amanda C. Sommerfeld (counsel for Defendant Kmart Corporation) re Discovery Dispute. (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 129 MOTION to Shorten Time To File Motion For Continuance Of Trial Date filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sommerfeld, #2 Declaration Barbieri, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 128 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM PLAINTIFF GARVEYS RULE 26 by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 12, 2012 Filing 127 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM (Defendant Kmart Corporation's Rule 26(A)(3) Pretrial Disclosures) by Kmart Corporation. (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 11, 2012 Filing 126 First MOTION for Discovery Sanctions For Failure To Comply With The Court's Evidence Preservation Order, MOTION for Sanctions filed by Lisa Garvey. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/17/2012. Replies due by 10/24/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION RE DISCOVERY SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURTS EVIDENCE PRESERVATION ORDER)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 11, 2012 Filing 125 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Lisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup granting #123 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 9, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 10/17/2012. Replies due by 10/24/2012. (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 8, 2012 Filing 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Briefing Schedule for Motion filed by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/8/2012) Modified on 10/9/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 10/15/2012. Replies due by 10/22/2012. (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF ALLEGED SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 2, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Filing 121 Letter from Matthew Righetti, Plaintiff's Counsel to Judge Alsup. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 18, 2012 Filing 120 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 13, 2012 Filing 119 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (11/13/2012) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (11/5/2012 at 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/1/3/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER of USCA Case No 12-80149, Petition for Permission to Appeal District Court's 7/18/2012 Order Granting Class action Ceritifciation Denied. (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012) Modified on 9/12/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE ]re #115 Letter Brief filed by Kmart Corporation, #114 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Kmart Corporation]. Responses due by noon on 9/17/2012. Four-hour meet-and-confer starting at 10:00 a.m. and continuing to 2:00 p.m. on 9/19/2012 in the Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 9/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/10/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 10, 2012 Filing 116 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 10, 2012 Filing 115 Letter Brief re #114 Discovery Letter Brief filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 10, 2012 Filing 114 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Emily C. Schuman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
August 30, 2012 Filing 113 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kevin J. McInerney (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING IN PART REQUEST FOR EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part #111 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension for Expert Discovery Deadlines filed by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO STAY by Hon. William Alsup denying #104 Motion to Stay.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 109 Reply in Support of ( #104 MOTION to Stay ) filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 8/22/2012) Modified on 8/23/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #104 MOTION to Stay . Replies due by 8/22/2012. (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER SCHEDULING EXPEDITED BRIEFING by Hon. William Alsup granting #105 Motion to Expedite.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 15, 2012 Filing 107 USCA Case Number 12-80149 USCA 9th Circuit (for Petition for Permission to Appeal) (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 13, 2012 Filing 106 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REQUEST A STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF KMARTS 23(F) PETITION (re #105 MOTION to Expedite Defendant Kmart Corporation's Administrative Motion for Expedited Briefing and Shortened Notice on Motion to Request a Stay Pending the Resolution of Kmart's 23(F) Petition, #104 MOTION to Stay filed byLisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2012) Modified on 8/14/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 Filing 105 MOTION to Expedite Defendant Kmart Corporation's Administrative Motion for Expedited Briefing and Shortened Notice on Motion to Request a Stay Pending the Resolution of Kmart's 23(F) Petition filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda C. Sommerfeld, #2 Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 Filing 104 Motion to Request a Stay filed by Kmart Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 8/24/2012. Replies due by 8/31/2012. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 8/10/2012) Modified on 8/13/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISCOVERY by Hon. William Alsup granting #102 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 8, 2012 Filing 102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Regarding Extension to Discovery Cut Off for Depositions, Plaintiff's Second 30(B)(6) Deposition, and Plaintiff's Request for 25 Additional Special Interrogatories; [Proposed] Order filed by Kmart Corporation, Sears Holding Management Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 7, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 6, 2012 Filing 101 RESPONSE to re #95 Discovery Letter Brief Plaintiff's' Response to Kmart's Request For Relief From Discovery Limits by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER REGARDING CLASS NOTICE re #96 Statement filed by Lisa Garvey, Kmart Corporation, #99 Errata filed by Lisa Garvey, #97 Statement filed by Kmart Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 99 ERRATA re #94 Statement JOINT STATEMENT RE CLASS LIST IN RESPONSE TO JULY 18, 2012 COURT ORDER (DOC. 94) by Lisa Garvey. (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re #95 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Kmart Corporation]. Meet-and-confer starting at 7:30 a.m. and continuing through to 11:30 a.m. on 8/7/2012 in the Court's jury room on the nineteenth floor of the federal courthouse. Response due by noon on 8/6/2012. Discovery Hearing set for 8/7/2012 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/31/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 97 Statement Defendant's Submission of Corrected Class List in Response to the Court's July 18, 2012 Order by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 96 JOINT STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS JULY 18, 2012 ORDER by Lisa Garvey, Kmart Corporation. (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 7/31/2012) Modified on 8/1/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2012 Filing 95 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 94 **Posted in error** See Item 97 Statement RE CLASS LIST IN RESPONSE TO JULY 18, 2012 COURT ORDER by Lisa Garvey, Kmart Corporation. (McInerney, Kevin) (Filed on 7/31/2012) Modified on 8/1/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2012 Filing 93 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 7/18/2012) re #75 First MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lisa Garvey. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS, APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL, AND APPOINTING CLASS REPRESENTATIVE by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part #75 Motion to Certify Class.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 91 NOTICE by Kmart Corporation, Sears Holding Management Corporation Defendant's Notice of Authority Referenced at Oral Argument in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 90 Statement Defendant's Submission in Response to the Court's July 18, 2012 Request Regarding Number of Putative Class Members in the Tulare Store During the Relevant Time Period by Kmart Corporation, Sears Holding Management Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 89 Statement PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION RE NUMBER OF CUSTOMER SERVICE ASSOCIATES (CSAs) AT TULARE STORE DURING CLASS PERIOD by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 88 RESPONSE to re #82 Order JOINT SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO JULY 9, 2012 COURT ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED CLASS LIST by Kmart Corporation, Sears Holding Management Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO FILE SUR-REPLY by Hon. William Alsup denying #84 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 86 RESPONSE (re #84 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT KMART CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE A SURREPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF ) PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE A SURREPLY filed byLisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE SURREPLY)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 85 RESPONSE (re #84 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT KMART CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE A SURREPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF ) PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE AND APPLICATION TO STRIKE KMARTS OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE filed byLisa Garvey. *** DECLARATION FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT OR RESPONSE AND APPLICATION TO STRIKE KMARTS OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2012) Modified on 7/11/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2012 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT KMART CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO FILE A SURREPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #2 Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 Filing 83 OBJECTIONS to re #76 Opposition/Response to Motion, DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO NEW EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #2 Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RE PROPOSED CLASS LIST. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 6, 2012 Filing 81 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #75 First MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 80 RESPONSE (re #75 First MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byLisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Steven Johnson, Ph.d in support of motion for class certifcation, #2 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO OPPOSITION RE: MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #3 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 19, 2012 Filing 79 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Zachariah Paul Dostart (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 11, 2012 Filing 78 NOTICE by Kmart Corporation re #76 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Compendium of Evidence) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-20, #3 Exhibit 21-35, #4 Exhibit 36-54, #5 Exhibit 55-70, #6 Exhibit 71-88, #7 Exhibit 89-106)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 11, 2012 Filing 77 Request for Judicial Notice re #76 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #76 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 11, 2012 Filing 76 RESPONSE (re #75 First MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) filed byKmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 75 First MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Lisa Garvey. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 6/11/2012. Replies due by 7/2/2012. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF KEVIN J. McINERNEY IN SUPPORT, #2 DECLARATION OF JAMES CLAPP IN SUPPORT, #3 DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT AND EXHIBITS 1-2, #4 DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT AND EXHIBITS 3 THRU 5, #5 DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT AND EXHIBITS 6 THRU 11, #6 DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT AND EXHIBITS 12 THRU 18, #7 DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT AND EXHIBITS 19 THRU 22, #8 DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT AND EXHIBITS 23 THRU 25, #9 DECLARATION OF MATTHEW RIGHETTI IN SUPPORT AND EXHIBITS 26 THRU 28)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 5/14/2012) Modified on 5/15/2012 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2012 Filing 74 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Srike the Expert Report of Miles E. Locker and Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Steven L. Johnson (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
April 23, 2012 Filing 73 ERRATA re #72 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Steven L. Johnson by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Amanda C. Sommerfeld, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #5 Exhibit 4A to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #6 Exhibit 4B to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #7 Exhibit 4C to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #8 Exhibit 4D to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #9 Exhibit 4E to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #10 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #11 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 23, 2012 Filing 72 MOTION to Strike filed by Kmart Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2012 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/7/2012. Replies due by 5/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 23, 2012 Filing 71 Request for Judicial Notice re #70 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Miles E. Locker filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #70 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 23, 2012 Filing 70 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Miles E. Locker filed by Kmart Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2012 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/7/2012. Replies due by 5/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Somerfeld, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld, #5 Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 20, 2012 Filing 69 CLARIFICATION OF DAUBERT MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 20, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND VACATING HEARINGS SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 19 by Hon. William Alsup denying #48 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 67 ERRATA re #64 Reply to Opposition/Response,, (Notice of Errata Regarding Defendant's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment) by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 9, 2012 Filing 66 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Kmart Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO of Its Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Steven L. Johnson) filed by Kmart Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 4/23/2012. Replies due by 4/30/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda Sommerfeld, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 - Part 1, #6 Exhibit 4 - Part 2, #7 Exhibit 4 - Part 3, #8 Exhibit 5 through 6, #9 Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 Filing 65 EXHIBITS re #63 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Kmart Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO of Its Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Miles E. Locker) (Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice) filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #63 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 Filing 64 REPLY (re #63 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Kmart Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO of Its Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Miles E. Locker), #62 MOTION to Expedite Defendant Kmart Corporation's Administrative Motion for Expedited Briefing and Shortened Notice on Motions to Strike the Expert Reports of Steven L. Johnson and Miles E. Locker ) filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration Amanda Sommerfeld, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 Filing 63 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Kmart Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO of Its Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Miles E. Locker) filed by Kmart Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 4/23/2012. Replies due by 4/30/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda Sommerfeld, #2 Exhibit 1 and 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Request for Judicial Notice)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 Filing 62 MOTION to Expedite Defendant Kmart Corporation's Administrative Motion for Expedited Briefing and Shortened Notice on Motions to Strike the Expert Reports of Steven L. Johnson and Miles E. Locker filed by Kmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amanda C. Sommerfeld, #2 Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 Filing 61 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing Time, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment). Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE by Lisa Garvey re #57 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, Of Errata Re Declaration of Matthew Righetti in Support of Plaintiff''s Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Errata Notice of Errata Part 2 (hook to Main document), #2 Errata Notice of Errata Part 3 (hook to part 2), #3 Errata Notice of Errata Part 4(hook to part 3))(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup granting #58 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment). Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE filed by Kmart Corporation. (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 16, 2012 Filing 57 RESPONSE (re #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment) ) filed byLisa Garvey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration declaration of matthew righetti in opposition to motion for summary judgment, #2 Exhibit ex. 1 and 2, #3 Exhibit ex. 3 to 3e, #4 Exhibit ex. 3f- 3j, #5 Exhibit ex. 3k to 3n, #6 Exhibit ex. 4, #7 Exhibit ex. 5, #8 Exhibit ex. 6, #9 Exhibit ex. 7, #10 Exhibit ex. 8a-8b, #11 Exhibit ex. 8 c, #12 Exhibit rest of exhibit 8c, #13 Exhibit exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit ex. 10, #15 Exhibit ex. 11, #16 Exhibit ex. 12, #17 Exhibit ex. 13, #18 Exhibit ex. 14, #19 Exhibit ex. 15, #20 Exhibit ex. 16, #21 Exhibit ex. 17)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULING by Hon. William Alsup granting #55 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
February 6, 2012 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULING filed by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
February 6, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment). Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 54 Proposed Order re #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment) ([Proposed] Judgment in Favor of Defendant Kmart Corporation and Against Plaintiff Lisa Garvey) by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 53 Proposed Order re #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment) by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 52 Request for Judicial Notice re #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 51 Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld in Support of #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 50 Declaration of Darin Johnson in Support of #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 49 Declaration of Robert Crandall in Support of #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byKmart Corporation. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Kmart Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 2/9/2012. Replies due by 2/16/2012. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
December 9, 2011 Filing 47 REDACTION OF DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG by Kmart Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 12/9/2011) Modified on 12/9/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/9/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2011 Filing 46 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Amanda C. Sommerfeld (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY HEARING re #41 Proposed Order filed by Lisa Garvey. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 29, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 29, 2011 Filing 44 Letter from Amanda C. Sommerfeld. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINE re #42 Letter filed by Kmart Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 29, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 42 Letter from Amanda C. Sommerfeld. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 41 Proposed Order re #39 Discovery Hearing by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 27, 2011 Filing 40 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-22-11, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2012. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2011)
November 22, 2011 Filing 39 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 11/22/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/22/2011). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/22/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re #34 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings]. Discovery Hearing set for 11/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Futher meet and confer set for 10:00 AM AND CONTINUING TO 1:30 PM in the Court's jury room on the nineteenth floor of the federal courthouse. Please buzz chambers to be let into jury room. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/21/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 18, 2011 Filing 37 Letter Brief filed byKmart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 18, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Emily Claire Schuman (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 18, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Claire Schuman (Schuman, Emily) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re #33 Letter filed by Lisa Garvey]. Further meet-and-confer on Tuesday, 11/22/2011, starting from 8:00 a.m. and continuing through to 11:30 a.m. in the Courts jury room on the nineteenth floor of the federal courthouse. Defendant's response to plaintiff's letter is due by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 11/18/2011. Discovery Hearing set for 11/22/2011 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/17/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 33 Letter from Michael Righett, Counsel for Plaintiff, Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS re #31 Proposed Order filed by Lisa Garvey. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 15, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 14, 2011 Filing 31 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order For Standard Litigation by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 30 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference re: scheduling held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 10/6/2011). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/6/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT re #26 Stipulation filed by Sears Holding Management Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 28, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 Filing 28 Declaration of Michael Righetti Following Court's Order Regarding Request to Substitute Defendant filed byLisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #26 Stipulation filed by Sears Holding Management Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 26, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 26 STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT by Sears Holding Management Corporation. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 13, 2011 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Mediation/Settlement. Bench Trial set for 11/13/2012 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Discovery due by 8/31/2012. Motions due by 10/4/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/12/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 25 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/8/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 9/8/2011). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/8/2011)
September 6, 2011 Filing 23 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lisa Garvey. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 1, 2011 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Sears Holding Management Corporation. (Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #20 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/9/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 16 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Sears Holding Management Corporation. (Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 15 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lisa Garvey.. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint bySears Holding Management Corporation. (Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sears Holding Management Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A-4A)(Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Marja-Liisa Overbeck Notice of Appearance of Michelle S. Kunihiro (Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Marja-Liisa Overbeck Notice of Appearance of Marja-Liisa (Mari) Overbeck (Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marja-Liisa Overbeck Notice of Appearance of Amanda C. Sommerfeld (Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sears Holding Management Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sears Holding Management Corporation re #7 ADR Scheduling Order, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/27/11. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sears Holding Management Corporation re #3 Statement, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Declaration in Support, #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice (Other) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PENDENCY by Sears Holding Management Corporation (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sears Holding Management Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Kmart Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate KMart Corporation, Other Affiliate Sears Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Sears, Roebuck and Co. for Sears Holding Management Corporation. re #1 Notice of Removal, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 3 Statement re #1 Notice of Removal, by Sears Holding Management Corporation. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 2 Declaration of Dorian R. Williams in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed bySears Holding Management Corporation. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL /no process from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG 11571349. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611060331). Filed bySears Holding Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garvey v. Kmart Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Garvey
Represented By: Charles Aubrey Jones
Represented By: Kelly A. McInerney
Represented By: James F. Clapp
Represented By: Kevin J. McInerney
Represented By: Marita Murphy Lauinger
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Zachariah Paul Dostart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Cline
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collette Delbridge
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holding Management Corporation
Represented By: Amanda C. Sommerfeld
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Gipson
Represented By: Marja-Liisa Overbeck
Represented By: Michelle Sara Strowhiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kmart Corporation
Represented By: E. Jeffrey Grube
Represented By: Elizabeth Jarvis MacGregor
Represented By: Jeffrey Patrick Michalowski
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Wohl
Represented By: Malaina R. Freedman
Represented By: Zachary P Hutton
Represented By: Amanda C. Sommerfeld
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Gipson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Kimberley
Represented By: Brittany A. Sachs
Represented By: Emily Claire Schuman
Represented By: Joan B. Tucker Fife
Represented By: Marja-Liisa Overbeck
Represented By: Michelle Sara Strowhiro
Represented By: Robb Christopher Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CA Labor Commissione Julie A Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Pan Oston Holding Company
Represented By: Kristin L. Oliveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Winston & Strawn LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey Jay Lederman
Represented By: Krista M. Enns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?