Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd v. AU Optronics Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America, Acer America Corporation, BenQ America Corp, Benq Corporation, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation and AU Optronics Corp.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02620
Filed: June 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSAL CASES re (69 in 3:11-cv-03170-EMC and C11-2620EMC Consolidated Cases) Stipulation and Order,. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE re (88 in 3:11-cv-02620-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order filed by Benq Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Sanyo Manufacturing Corporation, AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America, Acer America Corporation, Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd, BenQ America Corp. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO AMEND re (82 in 3:11-cv-02620-EMC) Stipulation, filed by Benq Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Sanyo Manufacturing Corporation, AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America, Acer America Corporation, BenQ America Corp. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/10/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Samsung to Respond to AUO's Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/20/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 71 . ORDER by Hon. Edward M. Chen granting 66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Dennis C. Lee. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER - Case Management and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Further Status/Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Tutorial Hearing set for 9/6/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/20/2012 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 35 Motion to Stay (Patent Nos. 6,281,955 and 7,697,093 only) in related case C11-3170 EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/12/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 Stipulation, filed by AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/15/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd v. AU Optronics Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Represented By: Neil Alan Rubin
Represented By: Robert Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BenQ America Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benq Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corp.
Represented By: Neil Alan Rubin
Represented By: Robert Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
Represented By: George A. Riley
Represented By: Jon Y Chow
Represented By: Brian Mark Berliner
Represented By: Yixin Zhang
Represented By: Xin-Yi Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?