Barnes & Noble Inc. v. LSI Corporation et al.
Plaintiff: Barnes & Noble Inc. and Barnesandnoble.com LLC
Defendant: LSI Corporation and Agere Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02709
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 318 Stipulation filed by Barnesandnoble.com LLC, Barnes & Noble Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 316 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 315 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JOINT) filed by Agere Systems LLC, LSI Corporation Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 8/28/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER Re Case Scheduling (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER Re Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER Re Claim Construction Hearing (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER REGARDING 251 THE PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER DATED OCTOBER 3, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/10/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER Re Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion 248 for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/7/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 247 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [JOINT] re Amendment to March 25, 2013 Case Management Order filed by LSI Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER REGARDING 237 THE PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER DATED AUGUST 23, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/13/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER regarding 214 the parties' discovery letter dated May 2, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/17/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION AND TUTORIAL HEARINGS. Motions terminated: 220 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 200 MOTION to Amend/Correct 198 MOTION to Amend/Correct LSI Corporation. Claims Constructio n Hearing set for 3/24/2014 02:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 3/10/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/25/2014 03:00 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 3/11/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/15/2013 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 217 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 193 to extend claim construction briefing deadlines on an interim basis by one week filed by Agere Systems LLC, LSI Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/7/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER regarding discovery conference to discuss source code production and sequence of discovery and amendments to infringement contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/19/2013. (lblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STIPULATION AND ORDER 192 REGARDING AMENDMENT TO FEBRUARY 15, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Barnesandnoble.com LLC, Barnes & Noble Inc. Tutorial Hearing set for 7/1/2013 and 7/2/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/22, 23 and 26, 2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/26/2013 02:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 159 Defendants' Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING 164 165 B&N's motions for issuance of letters rogatory. The court will sign and affix its seal to each of the revised proposed letters rogatory submitted (ECF No. 186 ) and return the letters with original signatures and seals to B&N's counsel for forwarding to the United States Department of State. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/5/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER directing B&N to submit revised proposed Letters of Request re 164 165 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/21/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES. Tutorial: 6/21/13 at 10:00 a.m. Claim Construction Hearing: 7/5/13 10:00 a.m. and 7/8/13 at 2:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER re 159 MOTION for relief from nondispositive pretrial order of magistrate judge Beeler filed by Agere Systems LLC, LSI Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/13. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER regarding 145 the parties' joint discovery letter dated December 14, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/9/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
December 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER re 140 Document E-Filed Under Seal filed by LSI Corporation: Order denying LSI's motion for a protective order raised in Docket 140; order setting telephonic hearing on 1/3/13 at 11 a.m. re joint letter brief at ECF No. 145. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 12/23/2012)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re 143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Agere Systems LLC, LSI Corporation, 141 MOTION to Continue ADR Deadline filed by Agere Systems LLC, LSI Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/17/2012. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING AGERE SYSTEMS LLC FOR AGREE SYSTEMS INC.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/7/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 128 re THIRD AMENDMENT TO JANUARY 31, 2012 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Barnesandnoble.com LLC, Barnes & Noble Inc., LSI Corporation, Agere Systems, Inc. Claims Construction Hearing reset for 4/29/2013 09:3 0 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 4/22/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 4/30/2013 09:30 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 4/23/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/1/2013 09:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 122 Second Amendment to January 31, 2012 Case Management Order filed by Barnesandnoble.com LLC, LSI Corporation, Agere Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING 106 Defendants' Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. The court will sign and affix its seal to the letter rogatory submitted and return the letter with original signature and seal to Defendants' counsel for forwarding to the United States Department of State. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/16/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING 99 Defendants' Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. The court will sign and affix its seal to each of the letters rogatory submitted and return the letters with original signatures and seals to Defendants counsel for forwarding to the United States Department of State. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/27/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER regarding 90 the parties' joint discovery letter dated March 14, 2012. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/26/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER regarding 78 the parties' joint discovery letter dated January 10, 2012. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/23/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 71 Defendants' Motion to Strike. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 77 Stipulation filed by LSI Corporation, Agere Systems, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE TIME FOR PATENT LOCAL RULE DISCLOSURES re 73 Stipulation filed by LSI Corporation, Agere Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/28/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE TIME FOR PATENT LOCAL RULE DISCLOSURES (2/3/12) re 64 Stipulation filed by LSI Corporation, Agere Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 21 45 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 Stipulation filed by LSI Corporation, Agere Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 09/19/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 12 Stipulation filed by LSI Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/24/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes & Noble Inc. v. LSI Corporation et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barnes & Noble Inc.
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Represented By: David Eiseman
Represented By: Melissa J Baily
Represented By: Carl Gunnar Anderson
Represented By: John B Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barnesandnoble.com LLC
Represented By: Carl Gunnar Anderson
Represented By: Melissa J Baily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Corporation
Represented By: Virginia K. DeMarchi
Represented By: Charlene Marie Morrow
Represented By: Ravi Ragavendra Ranganath
Represented By: Hector J. Ribera
Represented By: Ryan Aftel Tyz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agere Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Aftel Tyz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?