Morrison et al v. T. Rowe Price Investment Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Morrison
Defendant: T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., T. Rowe Price Investment Services, Inc., T. Rowe Price Services Inc and T. Rowe Price Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv02813
Filed: June 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The 3/20/14 Motion/CMC vacated.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/18/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Discovery Order re: Dkt. No. 69 . Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 22, 2013. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING (63) T. ROWE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/18/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013) Modified on 9/18/2013 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER VACATING ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION (Docket 65). PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL INFORMED THE COURT THAT AN OPPOSITION WILL BE FILED. OPPOSITION DUE 9/16/13. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2013. Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/21/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/11/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 To Submit Matter To Private Mediation and Continue Mediation Deadline filed by T. Rowe Price Services Inc, T. Rowe Price Investment Services, Inc., T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., T. Rowe Price Trust Company, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) Modified on 7/2/2013 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 31, 2013. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference Date filed by T. Rowe Price Services Inc, T. Rowe Price Investment Services, Inc., T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., T. Rowe Price Trust Company Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING re 46 Letter filed by T. Rowe Price Services Inc, T. Rowe Price Investment Services, Inc., T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., T. Rowe Price Trust Company For Diane P. Cragg to attend the 3/1/13 discovery hearing in lieu of lead trial counsel. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/27/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 37 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by T. Rowe Price Services Inc, T. Rowe Price Investment Services, Inc., T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., T. Rowe Price Trust Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/31/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 to Extend All Deadlines filed by Ashley Morrison Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 10/26/12 TO 11/30/12 re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 32 to Continue Case Management Conference Date and Corresponding Deadlines filed by T. Rowe Price Services Inc, T. Rowe Price Inves tment Services, Inc., T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., T. Rowe Price Trust Company Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE. CMC reset from 6/22/12 to 10/26/12 at 9:00 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/22/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 23 Ex Parte Application to appear by phone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/19/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison et al v. T. Rowe Price Investment Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rowe Price Group, Inc.
Represented By: Vishali Singal
Represented By: Luanne R. Sacks
Represented By: Deborah E. McCrimmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rowe Price Investment Services, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah E. McCrimmon
Represented By: Luanne R. Sacks
Represented By: Vishali Singal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rowe Price Services Inc
Represented By: Deborah E. McCrimmon
Represented By: Luanne R. Sacks
Represented By: Vishali Singal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rowe Price Trust Company
Represented By: Deborah E. McCrimmon
Represented By: Luanne R. Sacks
Represented By: Vishali Singal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Morrison
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Represented By: Jonathan B. Gaskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?