Willner v. Manpower Inc.
Plaintiff: Vera Willner
Defendant: Manpower Inc.
Interested Party: Claudia Padilla and Leslie Guido
Case Number: 3:2011cv02846
Filed: June 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/25/2016, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (48 in 3:15-cv-04866-JST) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2016. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: Case No. 15-cv-4866-TEH. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/05/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Leslie Guido, Claudia Padilla for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Toole, Patrick) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/18/15, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #211 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2016. (Related documents(s) #211 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Leslie Guido, Claudia Padilla for Court Reporter Kelly Polvi. (Toole, Patrick) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Manpower Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Manpower Inc. for Court Reporter Kelly Polvi. (Johnson, Timothy) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/13/2014, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Polvi, telephone number 503.779.7406; kpolvi@comcast.net. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2015. (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARD by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part #199 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting #201 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Fairness Hearing held on 6/18/2015. Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2015 re #199 MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs, and Service Award filed by Vera Willner; #201 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of of Class Action Settlement filed by Vera Willner. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #203 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Declaration of Daniellle Behring in Support of #201 MOTION for Final Approval of of Class Action Settlement (Supplemental) filed by Vera Willner. (Related document(s) #201 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 EXHIBITS re #203 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Class Member List Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement ADDING DECLARATION OF DANIELLE BEHRING SUBMITTING CLASS LIST filed byManpower Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #203 ) (Abell, Nancy) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Class Member List Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit)(Abell, Nancy) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 RESPONSE to (re #201 MOTION for Final Approval of of Class Action Settlement); -Statement of Non-Opposition to Relief Requested by Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Manpower Inc.. (Abell, Nancy) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Vera Willner. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 5/28/2015. Replies due by 6/4/2015. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order, #(2) Declaration of Laura L. Ho, #(3) Declaration of Kirk D. Hanson, #(4) Declaration of Danielle Behring)(Kan, James) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 RESPONSE to (re #199 MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs, and Service Award); -Defendant MANPOWERGROUP INC.'S Statement of Non-Opposition to Relief Requested by Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Award filed by Manpower Inc.. (Abell, Nancy) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees Costs, and Service Award filed by Vera Willner. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/27/2015. Replies due by 4/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura HO, #2 Declaration Kirk Hanson, #3 Declaration Vera Willner, #4 Appendix)(Ho, Laura) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW FROM ACTION AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #197 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Regina Anne Musolino; Brian Edward Spang; Matthew C. Kane and Sylvia Jihae Kim terminated. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Administrative Motion) filed by Manpower Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spang, Brian) (Filed on 2/18/2015) Modified on 2/18/2015 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING RENEWED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #184 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2015: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing: Fairness Hearing set for 6/18/2015 at 2:00 PM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 11/13/2014. (Date Filed: 11/13/2014) re #184 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Vera Willner Court Reporter: Kelly Polvi. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 [Proposed] Order re #184 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement - (Revised) filed by Vera Willner. (Ho, Laura) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Vera Willner. (Ho, Laura) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE filed by Manpower Inc. re #191 Notice; Notice of Filing Errata Signatures of ManpowerGroup Inc. and Counsel for ManpowerGroup Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Errata)(Abell, Nancy) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE filed by Manpower Inc. re #188 Errata; Notice of Errata Re Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release (Abell, Nancy) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE re #187 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Leslie Guido. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 REPLY (re #184 RENEWED MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement) filed by Vera Willner. (Ho, Laura) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE OF ERRATA Re Joint Stipulation of Settlement & Release re #184 RENEWED MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Vera Willner. (Ho, Laura) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 RESPONSE (re #184 RENEWED MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement); Conditional Opposition and/or Request to Continue Hearing Date filed by Leslie Guido. (Attachments: #(1) Request for Judicial Notice)(Toole, Patrick) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 RESPONSE (re #184 RENEWED MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement); -Defendant Manpower Inc.'s Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Manpower Inc.. (Abell, Nancy) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing as to #184 RENEWED MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. The Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing previously set for 11/05/2014 are CONTINUED to 11/13/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. The Joint Case Management Conference statement is due 10/30/2014. All other deadlines remain the same. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 RENEWED MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Vera Willner. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/15/2014. Replies due by 10/22/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura L. Ho, #2 Declaration of Kirk D. Hanson, #3 Proposed Order)(Ho, Laura) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES AND GRANTING REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #171 Motion to Relate Case. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE filed by Manpower Inc. re #160 Order, #162 Response; -Supplemental Notice of Other Pending Lawsuits (Spang, Brian) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 RESPONSE (re #171 MOTION to Relate Case or Consolidate); - (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO RELATE CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 AND 7-11) filed by Manpower Inc.. (Spang, Brian) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER re #171 MOTION to Relate Case or Consolidate filed by Claudia Padilla. Although the Padilla plaintiffs use the word "consolidated" in the caption of their motion, they make no argument in support of that relief. Accordingly, the Court construes the motion solely as an administrative motion to relate pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 and 7-11. Therefore, any opposition is due by September 8, 2014. Unless otherwise ordered, there will be no hearing on the motion. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4, 2014. This is a text-only order; there is no document associated with this entry. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 11/5/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Statement is due by 10/22/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 9/4/2014 is VACATED. This is a text only order. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF A CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #150 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Claudia Padilla re #175 Proposed Order, #173 Declaration in Support, #172 Declaration in Support, #171 MOTION to Relate Case or Consolidate, #174 Request for Judicial Notice, on Kirk David Hanson by mail (Toole, Patrick) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Proposed Order re #171 MOTION to Relate Case or Consolidate by Claudia Padilla. (Toole, Patrick) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Request for Judicial Notice re #171 MOTION to Relate Case or Consolidate filed byClaudia Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #171 ) (Toole, Patrick) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Declaration of Patrick D. Toole in Support of #171 MOTION to Relate Case or Consolidate filed byClaudia Padilla. (Related document(s) #171 ) (Toole, Patrick) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Declaration of Charles Swanston in Support of #171 MOTION to Relate Case or Consolidate filed byClaudia Padilla. (Related document(s) #171 ) (Toole, Patrick) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION to Relate Case or Consolidate filed by Claudia Padilla. (Toole, Patrick) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 REPLY (re #150 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #168 filed byLeslie Guido, Claudia Padilla. (Swanston, Charles) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy L. Abell (Abell, Nancy) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REPLY (re #150 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) Further Conditional Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Request for Consolidation filed byLeslie Guido, Claudia Padilla. (Swanston, Charles) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 REPLY (re #150 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) Request for Judicial Notice in Support Further Conditional Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Request for Consolidation filed byLeslie Guido, Claudia Padilla. (Swanston, Charles) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REPLY (re #150 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) Declaration of Charles Swanston in Support of Further Conditional Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Request for Consolidation filed byLeslie Guido, Claudia Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J)(Swanston, Charles) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 REPLY (re #150 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) Declaration of B. James Fitzpatrick in Support of Conditional Opposition and/ir Request to Continue Hearing Date filed byLeslie Guido, Claudia Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Swanston, Charles) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REPLY (re #150 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) filed byClaudia Padilla. (Swanston, Charles) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REPLY (re #150 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) filed byVera Willner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kirk Hanson)(Ho, Laura) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 RESPONSE to re #160 Order, Requiring Response to Objections to Class Action Case Settlement by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A thorugh E)(Spang, Brian) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Vera Willner. (Ho, Laura) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS re #154 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Leslie Guido, Claudia Padilla; #150 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Vera Willner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 20, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Request for Judicial Notice re #154 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byLeslie Guido, Claudia Padilla. (Related document(s) #154 ) (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2014: #1 Request for Judicial Notice - [part 2]) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2014: #2 Request for Judicial Notice - [part 3]) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2014: #3 Request for Judicial Notice - [part 4]) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2014: #4 Request for Judicial Notice - [part 5]) (tnS, ).
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Declaration of Charles Swanston in Support of #154 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byLeslie Guido, Claudia Padilla. (Related document(s) #154 ) (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014) (tnS, ).
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Declaration of Patrick D. Toole in Support of #154 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byLeslie Guido, Claudia Padilla. (Related document(s) #154 ) (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Declaration of B. James Fitzpatrick in Support of #154 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byLeslie Guido, Claudia Padilla. (Related document(s) #154 ) (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 RESPONSE (re #150 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) filed byLeslie Guido, Claudia Padilla. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 8/20/2014 is CONTINUED to 9/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Statement is due by 8/21/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 CLERK'S NOTICE Advancing Motion Hearing as to re #150 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. The hearing on this motion is ADVANCED from 9/11/2014 to 9/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. All other deadlines remain the same. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #150 Plaintiff's MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Plaintiff's Request for an Order Shortening Time filed by Manpower Inc.. (Related document(s) #150 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Vera Willner. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 8/15/2014. Replies due by 8/22/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura L. Ho, #2 Declaration of Kirk D. Hanson, #3 Proposed Order)(Ho, Laura) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #148 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE FOR DEFENDANTS FILING OF ANSWER TO FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Vera Willner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 10, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE FOR DEFENDANTS FILING OF ANSWER TO FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Vera Willner. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Ho, Laura) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #120 MOTION to Certify Class. At the request of the parties, the Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2014 is CONTINUED to 9/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE by Vera Willner OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING (Ho, Laura) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byVera Willner. (Ho, Laura) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICEDefendant's Request for Judicial Notice, ECF No. 143, is denied. The request, which consumes 276 pages, was filed on July 1, 2014, two days before the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for class certification, and 56 days after the briefing on that motion closed. Local Rule 7-3(d) provides that "[o]nce a reply is filed, no additional memoranda, papers or letters may be filed without prior Court approval," except in circumstances not present here. Thus, on any reading of the rule, Defendant's request is untimely. The court further notes that Defendant did not seek the court's approval prior to filing these materials.The court issues this ruling in advance of the hearing to make clear that Plaintiff is not required to respond to the request and that the materials appended to ECF No. 143 will not be considered at the hearing.(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Request for Judicial Notice re #127 Opposition/Response to Motion; -SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Manpower Inc.. (Related document(s) #127 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byManpower Inc.. (Related document(s) #127 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS OR TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #121 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/5/2014, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Pence, Telephone number (619) 587-0173, e-mail: james_pence@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #139 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2014. (Related documents(s) #139 ) (Pence, James) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Vera Willner for Court Reporter James Pence. (Ho, Laura) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2014 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 6/5/2014) re #121 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION IN FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND/OR TO ORDER AMENDMENT OF INACCURATE WAGE STATEMENT CLASS ALLEGATIONS CONTAINED THEREIN filed by Manpower Inc. (Court Reporter: James Pence.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/5/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Start Time of Motion Hearing as to #121 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 will begin at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 OBJECTIONS to re #132 Reply to Opposition/Response; OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Manpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #133 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #120 MOTION for Class Certification; STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Manpower Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 7, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #120 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 REPLY (re #121 MOTION to Dismiss; DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION IN FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND/OR TO ORDER AMENDMENT OF INACCURATE WAGE STATEMENT CLASS ALLEGATIONS CONTAINED THEREIN); -DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE PLAINTIFFS SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION IN FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND/OR TO ORDER AMENDMENT OF INACCURATE WAGE STATEMENT CLASS ALLEGATIONS CONTAINED THEREIN filed by Manpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #120 MOTION for Class Certification; STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 REPLY (re #120 MOTION for Class Certification) filed by Vera Willner. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Laura L. Ho)(Ho, Laura) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 RESPONSE to (re #121 MOTION to Dismiss; DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION IN FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND/OR TO ORDER AMENDMENT OF INACCURATE WAGE STATEMENT CLASS ALLEGATIONS CONTAINED THEREIN) filed by Vera Willner. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Joseph E. Jaramillo)(Ho, Laura) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ERRATA to re #127 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification; Notice of Errata Regarding Defendant Manpower Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Manpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 DECLARATION of Matthew C. Kane (Part 2 of 2) in Support of re #127 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class Certification filed by Manpower Inc.. (Related document(s) #127 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 DECLARATION of Matthew C. Kane (Part 1 of 2) in Support of re #127 Opposition/Response to Motion for Class certification filed by Manpower Inc.. (Related document(s) #127 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE to (re #120 MOTION for Class Certification) filed by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Steven T. Cooney, #2 Evidentiary Objections, #3 Objections to Proposed Class Notice)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina Anne Musolino (Musolino, Regina) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 6/4/2014 is CONTINUED to 8/20/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Statement is due by 8/6/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292 OR FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DENYING MOTION TO VACATE SCHEDULE AND STAY ACTION AS MOOT; CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying #122 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying #123 Motion Vacate, Stay or Continue Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #120 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION for Administrative Relief to Vacate, Stay or Continue Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. #120) re #120 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Manpower Inc.. Responses due by 4/19/2014. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability; DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF MARCH 31, 2014 ORDER (DKT. #117) PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1292(b) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION THEREOF UNDER LOCAL RULE 7-9, AND FOR STAY OF ACTION PENDING PURSUIT OF INTERLOCUTORY APPELLATE REVIEW filed by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to Dismiss; DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION IN FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND/OR TO ORDER AMENDMENT OF INACCURATE WAGE STATEMENT CLASS ALLEGATIONS CONTAINED THEREIN filed by Manpower Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/29/2014. Replies due by 5/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Class Certification; Memorandum of Points & Authorites in Support Thereof filed by Vera Willner. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/23/2014. Replies due by 4/30/2014. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order, #(2) Declaration of Kirk D. Hanson, #(3) Declaration of Laura L. Ho, #(4) Declaration of Vera Willner)(Ho, Laura) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 CLERK' S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 6/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Statement is due by 5/21/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 AMENDED COMPLAINT; Fifth Amended Complaint against Manpower Inc.. Filed by Vera Willner. (Ho, Laura) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MANPOWER'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT; GRANTING WILLNER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part #76 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting #100 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document; granting #101 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SUR-REPLY Brief re #76 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, Alternatively, Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment filed by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #76 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application To Submit New Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Manpower Inc.'s Motion for Full, or Alternatively Partial, Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary JudgmentPlaintiff's Ex Parte Application To Submit New Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Manpower Inc.'s Motion for Full, or Alternatively Partial, Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment, ECF No. 95, is granted. Defendant may, but is not required to, file a sur-reply of not longer than eight pages. The brief must be limited to whether this newly proferred evidence is adequate to create a triable issue of material fact regarding whether Manpower's violations, if any, of California Labor Code section 226(a) were "knowing and intentional." The brief must be filed within ten court days of this order.(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar. This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 OBJECTIONS to re #113 Reply to Opposition/Response AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISIONS RE THE PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Manpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPLY (re #101 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISIONS RE THE PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byVera Willner. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #101 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Vera Willner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 30, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Statement re #101 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #76 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, Alternatively, Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment by Manpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 OBJECTIONS to re #108 Reply to Opposition/Response DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF KIRK D. HANSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Manpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #100 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Vera Willner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPLY (re #101 MOTION for Summary Judgment); PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byVera Willner. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration)(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE OR CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Manpower Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO VACATE OR CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPLY (re #100 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint) to Defendant's Oppsotion to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Vera Willner. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE to (re #101 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Matthew C. Kane, #(2) Objections to and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #(3) Objections to and Motion to Strike Declaration of Kirk D. Hanson)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE to (re #100 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint) filed by Manpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Declaration of Kirk D. Hanson in Support of re #101 MOTION for Summary Judgment; (Re-filed to reflect correct format) filed by Vera Willner. (Related document(s) #101 ) (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Summary Judgment and Points & Authorities in Support of Motion filed by Vera Willner. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/27/2013. Replies due by 12/4/2013. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Plaintiff Vera Willner's Declaration, #3 Declaration of Kirk D. Hanson, #4 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Vera Willner. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/21/2013. Replies due by 12/2/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kirk D. Hanson ISO Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RESPONSE to (re #95 Ex-Parte Application To Submit New Evidence in Support of Plaitniff's Opposition to Defendant Manpower Inc.'s Motion for Full, or Alternatively Partial, Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment) filed by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE filed by Manpower Inc. of Intent to Oppose re #95 Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application To Submit New Evidence in Support of Plaitniff's Opposition to Defendant Manpower Inc.'s Motion for Full, or Alternatively Partial, Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/2/13, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporter, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2014. (Related documents(s) #96 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Manpower Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Ex-Parte Application To Submit New Evidence in Support of Plaitniff's Opposition to Defendant Manpower Inc.'s Motion for Full, or Alternatively Partial, Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment filed by Vera Willner. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by James Kan (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 10/23/2013 is CONTINUED to 12/18/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Statement is due by 12/4/2013. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joseph E. Jaramillo (Jaramillo, Joseph) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Vacate or Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 22, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Vacate or Continue Case Management Conference filed by Manpower Inc., Vera Willner. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 8/2/2013) re #76 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, Alternatively, Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment filed by Manpower Inc. (Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/2/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Discovery Order re: Dkt. Nos. 86, 87. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/23/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Letter from Manpower Inc. in Response to Plaintiff's Letter Requesting Court's Assistance Resolving Discovery Dispute [Dkt. #86]. (Kim, Sylvia) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Letter from Joseph E, Jarramillo Requesting Court's Assistance Resolving Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 5)(Jaramillo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Defendant Manpower Inc.'s ANSWER to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Manpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPLY in Support of (re #76 MOTION for Full, or Alternatively, Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment) filed byManpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #82 . Signed by District Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only docket entry) (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 APPLICATION of Attorney Brian E. Spang for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, [Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-7834599] filed by Manpower Inc.. (Spang, Brian) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESPONSE to (re #76 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, Alternatively, Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment); Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Manpower Inc.'s Motion for Full, or Alternatively Partial, Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment filed by Vera Willner. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Joseph E. Jaramillo, #(2) Declaration Vera Willner)(Jaramillo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; Fourth Amended Complaint against Manpower Inc.. Filed by Vera Willner. (Jaramillo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting re #68 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to re #76 MOTION for Full, or Alternatively, Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment. Due to the Court's unavailability the Motion Hearing previously noticed for 8/1/2013 is continued to 8/2/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #68 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Vera Willner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 20, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Full or, Alternatively, Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and/or Summary Judgment filed by Manpower Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 7/3/2013. Replies due by 7/10/2013. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Bonnie Matson, #(2) Declaration of Carol Schenk, #(3) [Proposed] Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO PHASE PROCEEDINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying re #64 Motion For Entry of Initial Scheduling Order Phasing Proceedings. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OBJECTIONS to re #73 Reply to Opposition/Response; OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S REPLY EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENTS IMPROPERLY SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JOSEPH E. JARAMILLO AND EXHIBITS THERETO filed by Manpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY in Support of (re #68 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint), ISO Motion for Leave to File 4th Amended Complaint filed by Vera Willner. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration (Supplemental) of Joseph E. Jaramallo)(Jaramillo, Joseph) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #64 MOTION For Entry of Initial Scheduling Order Phasing Proceedings filed by Manpower Inc., re #68 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint> filed by Vera Willner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 2, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings as to #68 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE (re #68 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint ) filed byManpower Inc.. (Kim, Sylvia) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #66 DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE [DKT. #49 & #63] AND/OR FOR FURTHER STAY OF SAME, filed by Manpower Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 21, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPLY in Support of (re #64 MOTION For Entry of Initial Scheduling Order Phasing Proceedings) filed byManpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION, AND MOTION and MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in Support of MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Vera Willner. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Joseph E. Jaramillo, #(2) [Proposed] Order) (Jaramillo, Joseph) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE to (re #64 MOTION For Entry of Initial Scheduling Order Phasing Proceedings) filed by Vera Willner. (Jaramillo, Joseph) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OBJECTIONS to re #49 Order, #63 Order on Discovery Letter Brief DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE [DKT. #49 & #63] AND/OR FOR FURTHER STAY OF SAME by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H (Part 1), #9 Exhibit H (Part 2), #10 Exhibit I, #11 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, as to #64 MOTION For Entry of Initial Scheduling Order Phasing Proceedings. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 5/8/2013 is continued to 5/9/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The hearing on the #64 Motion for Entry of Initial Scheduling Order previously noticed for 5/2/2013 is continued to 5/9/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION For Entry of Initial Scheduling Order Phasing Proceedings; Memorandum of Points & Authorities; [Proposed] Initial Scheduling Order Phasing Proceedings filed by Manpower Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/11/2013. Replies due by 4/18/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kim, Sylvia) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part #60 Discovery Letter Brief (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #61 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 4/2/2013 is continued to 5/8/2013 at 2:00 PM. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this Order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kim, Sylvia) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Protective Order Limiting Use of Class Contact Information filed by Manpower Inc.. (Kim, Sylvia) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Manpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 2/11/2013. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER VACATING DISCOVERY MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/21/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE to re #54 Order, #53 Letter AND Request for Reconsideration of Order for Parties to Appear for Courtroom Meet and Confer Session [Dkt. #54] by Manpower Inc.. (Kim, Sylvia) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO APPEAR FOR DISCOVERY MEET AND CONFER re #53 Letter filed by Vera Willner. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/19/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Letter from Lin Yee Chan Requesting Telephonic Conference. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lin Yee Chan)(Chan, Lin) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DISCOVERY ORDER re #51 Notice (Other), filed by Manpower Inc., #50 Letter filed by Vera Willner. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/13/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE by Manpower Inc. re #49 Order, #50 Letter NOTICE OF LODGING DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.'S PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE [DKT. NO. 49] AND OF PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING SAME (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Letter from Plaintiff re Proposed Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chan, Lin) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DISCOVERY ORDER re #46 Letter Brief, filed by Vera Willner. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/16/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/15/2012. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order - discovery)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REFERRING CASE to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for all Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Letter Brief filed byVera Willner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Request or Production of Documents No. 1, #2 Exhibit Documents re Manpowers common wage payment policies), #3 Exhibit DLSE Opinion Letters dated July 7, 2008 and December 18, 1992, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs Amended Initial Disclosures, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs 12/16/2010 Earnings Statement & Pay Check)(Chan, Lin) (Filed on 10/8/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Defendant Manpower Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint byManpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against Manpower Inc.. Filed byVera Willner. (Jaramillo, Joseph) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REGARDING MANPOWER INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byVera Willner. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Chan, Lin) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING #40 STIPULATION STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) AND/OR 23(d)(1)(D). Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) AND/OR 23(d)(1)(D) filed by Manpower Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE - Certified Copy of Order #39 sent via Certified Mail to California Attorney General. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF CERTIFICATION; INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK; AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D). Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byVera Willner. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Chan, Lin) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE by Manpower Inc. OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION (Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.1(a) and Civ. L.R. 3-8) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY (re #34 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) ) filed byManpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE (re #34 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) ) filed byVera Willner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chan, Lin) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) filed by Manpower Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/9/2011. Replies due by 11/16/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D))(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE striking without prejudice #32 Motion to Dismiss (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011) Modified on 10/25/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) filed by Manpower Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/4/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D))(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Manpower Inc.. Filed byVera Willner. (Jaramillo, Joseph) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REGARDING PARTIES STIPULATION: #28 Stipulation for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND FRCP 26(f) REPORT filed by Manpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Vera Willner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Jaramillo, Joseph) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) ) filed byManpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f) ) filed byManpower Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Request for Judicial Notice re #22 Opposition/Response to Motion, #23 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byVera Willner. (Related document(s) #22 , #23 ) (Chan, Lin) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Declaration of Kirk D. Hanson in Support of #22 Opposition/Response to Motion, #23 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byVera Willner. (Related document(s) #22 , #23 ) (Chan, Lin) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) ) filed byVera Willner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chan, Lin) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f) ) filed byVera Willner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chan, Lin) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vera Willner (Chan, Lin) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Hearing on Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss. Opposition and Reply dates remain as set. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed byManpower Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Renotice motion hearing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f) filed byManpower Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f), #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Responses due by 7/20/2011. Replies due by 7/27/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vera Willner (Attachments: #1 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT)(Chan, Lin) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lin Yee Chan (Chan, Lin) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/1/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order ***Deadlines terminated: Counsel has been notified to re-notice their motions to an open and available date on Judge White's calendar (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011) Modified on 6/28/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed byManpower Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Renotice motion hearing re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f) filed byManpower Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on June 27, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED to Judge Jeffrey S. White Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f) #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California or, Alternatively, Central District of California Pursuant to First-to-File Rule and/or 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Manpower Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/8/2011. Replies due by 7/15/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or FRCP 12(f) filed by Manpower Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/8/2011. Replies due by 7/15/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Manpower Inc. and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Kim, Sylvia) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Manpower Inc., Vera Willner. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 6/17/2011) Modified on 6/20/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Manpower Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice (Other), #5 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Declaration in Support and Notice to State Court of Removal (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Manpower Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011) (tn, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of No Related Cases by Manpower Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011) (tn, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Declaration of Scott Schwartz in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Manpower Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011) (tn, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - [No Process] from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG11566221. [Filing Fee: $350.00, receipt number 34611060884] Filed by Manpower Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2013: #1 Notice of Removal) (tn, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willner v. Manpower Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Willner
Represented By: James Kan
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Jackson
Represented By: Joseph E. Jaramillo
Represented By: Kirk David Hanson,
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Lin Yee Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpower Inc.
Represented By: Brian Edward Spang
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Nancy L. Abell
Represented By: Regina Anne Musolino
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Represented By: Timothy Lloyd Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Claudia Padilla
Represented By: Charles Swanston
Represented By: Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: David E Cameron
Represented By: Patrick Darryn Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Leslie Guido
Represented By: Charles Swanston
Represented By: Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: David E Cameron
Represented By: Patrick Darryn Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?