Wong v. Thomson Reuters Markets LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Justin Wong
Defendant: Thomson Reuters LLC, Jeffrey Walsh and Yasir Fattah
Case Number: 3:2011cv02864
Filed: June 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Bench Trial set for 9/10/2012 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Discovery due by 5/31/2012. Motions due by 7/5/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/16/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 24 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/15/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 9/15/2011), Case referred to Private ADR. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/15/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting By Plaintiff and Defendant (Jointly). (Jonas, Kent) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Thomson Reuters LLC (Thompson, Tzaddi) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/3/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 20 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Thomson Reuters LLC. (Thompson, Tzaddi) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup denying 11 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2011 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 18, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 18, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended Notice of Motion and) Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim [Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6)] MOTION to Dismiss (Amended Notice of Motion and) Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim [Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6)]. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 18, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 17 STIPULATION re Continuance of Hrg of Mtn to Dismiss by Justin Wong. (Stephenson, Mathew) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing Time. Motion 8/4/2011 2:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 13, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended Notice of Motion and) Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim [Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6)]. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 15 REPLY (re 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended Notice of Motion and) Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim [Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6)] ) filed by Yasir Fattah, Jeffrey Walsh. (Dolinko, Robert) (Filed on 7/11/2011) Modified on 7/13/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2011 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice re 13 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Dismiss filed byJustin Wong. (Related document(s) 13 ) (Stephenson, Mathew) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 13 RESPONSE (re 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended Notice of Motion and) Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim [Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6)]) filed by Justin Wong. (Stephenson, Mathew) (Filed on 7/5/2011) Modified on 7/6/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2011 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yasir Fattah, Thomson Reuters LLC, Jeffrey Walsh re Case Referred to ECF, 4 ADR Scheduling Order (Dolinko, Robert) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended Notice of Motion and) Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim [Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6)] filed by Yasir Fattah, Jeffrey Walsh. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 7/5/2011. Replies due by 7/11/2011. (Dolinko, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/20/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/20/11. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 MOTIONS 7 MOTION to Dismiss REFERRED to Judge William H. Alsup. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Yasir Fattah, Jeffrey Walsh. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 7/1/2011. Replies due by 7/8/2011. (Dolinko, Robert) (Filed on 6/17/2011) Modified on 6/20/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2011 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Yasir Fattah, Thomsom Reuters (Markets) LLC, Jeffrey Walsh. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 3 Declaration of Jeffrey Walsh in Support of 1 Notice of Removal filed by Yasir Fattah, Thomsom Reuters (Markets) LLC, Jeffrey Walsh. (Related document(s) 1 ) (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 2 Declaration of Helen Stamatiadis in Support of 1 Notice of Removal filed by Yasir Fattah, Thomsom Reuters (Markets) LLC, Jeffrey Walsh. (Related document(s) 1 ) (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (no process) from San Francissco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-11-510917. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611060920). Filed by Jeffrey Walsh, Thomsom Reuters (Markets) LLC, Yasir Fattah. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 Answer to 1 Removal Complaint by Yasir Fattah, Thomsom Reuters (Markets) LLC, Jeffrey Walsh. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wong v. Thomson Reuters Markets LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Wong
Represented By: Deborah Marie Kochan
Represented By: Mathew Nimrod Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Reuters LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Dolinko
Represented By: Kent Jonas
Represented By: Tzaddi Smith Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Walsh
Represented By: Robert A. Dolinko
Represented By: Kent Jonas
Represented By: Tzaddi Smith Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yasir Fattah
Represented By: Robert A. Dolinko
Represented By: Kent Jonas
Represented By: Tzaddi Smith Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?