Cisneros v. American General Financial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lucresia Cisneros
Defendant: American General Financial Services, Inc., Hispanic Educational, Inc. and Logic's Consulting, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02869
Filed: June 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT re 116 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/13/2015. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/5/2015. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re 90 Status Report filed by Lucresia Cisneros Motion for Preliminary Approval due by 5/22/2015. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Status Conference set for 4/24/2015 is vacated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/22/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 74 STIPULATION re 65 MOTION to Certify Class MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, CONTINUING HEARING TO AUGUST 15, 2014 AND INCREASING PAGE LIMIT TO 25 PAGES filed by American G eneral Financial Services, Inc.. Reset Deadlines as to 65 MOTION to Certify Class . Responses due by 7/15/2014. Replies due by 7/22/2014. Motion Hearing reset for 8/15/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/3/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 63 Ex Parte Application of Defendant Springleaf Financial Services, Inc. To Set Case Management Conference On Or Before July 11, 2014 filed by American General Financial Services, Inc.. Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/30/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ORDER re 57 Stipulation and Order terminate deadlines, setting cmc. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/2/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, ***Deadlines terminated. 56 Proposed Order filed by Lucresia Cisneros. Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2013 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/2/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Class Certification Motion filed by Lucresia Cisneros. Motion for class certification due by 5/6/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/4/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Further Case Management Conference and Submission of Joint Case Management Statement filed by American General Financial Services, Inc.. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2012. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/5/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/4/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 32 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 13 Stipulation filed by American General Financial Services, Inc., Set Deadlines as to 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. Responses due by 10/5/2011. Replies due by 10/19/2011. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Motion to remand due by 10/5/2011.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/7/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisneros v. American General Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucresia Cisneros
Represented By: Nancy Barron
Represented By: Bryan Kemnitzer
Represented By: William M. Krieg
Represented By: Amy S Tay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Seth Michael Goldstein
Represented By: JiAe Moon
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hispanic Educational, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logic's Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?