Rodman v. Safeway, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Rodman
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv03003
Filed: June 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER APPROVING JUDGMENT DISTRIBUTION PLAN AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARD by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 478 Motion for Attorney Fees. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 477 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 476 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Exonerating Bond and Surety filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 19, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER REGARDING JUDGMENT DISTRIBUTION re 474 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order Regarding Judgment Distribution filed by Michael Rodman. Notice to the Class and Posting of Notice/FAQs t o Case Website: Not later than 12/15/2017. Class Counsel's Motion for Attorney Fees, reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award 1/4/2018. Class Member Objection Deadline 3/2/2018. Class Counsel's Response, and any Response of Safeway t o Any Objection or Other Responses by Class Members 3/16/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part 434 Motion for Sanctions. Correction of ECF No. 465. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 434 Motion for Sanctions. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 460 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 458 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 15, 2016. Correction of ECF No. 459. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 455 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 10, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 445 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 442 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Plaintiff's Motion For Sanctions filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 10, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 437 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 432 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 431 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Deadlines for Motion for Sanctions filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 427 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 423 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER -- Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Approving Interim Notice to Class Members filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 416 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 415 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Approval Of Supersedeas Bond And Stay Of Execution And Enforcement Of Judgment Pending Appeal filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 414 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 413 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Further Extension Of Stay Of Execution And Enforcement Of Judgment filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 411 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER For Extension Of Stay Of Execution And Enforcement Of Judgment And Approval Of Supersedeas Bond Amount filed by Safeway Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 11, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 409 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 407 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING POST-JUDGMENT DEADLINES filed by Michael Rodman. Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 7, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 406 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 11/30/2015. (jstlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 397 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 392 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 19, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 386 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER RE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 384 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 19, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENT SEARCH PROTOCOLS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 14, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER re 371 Letter filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER re 371 Letter filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 10/01/2015. (jstlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER AMENDING PRIOR ORDER re 331 ORDER 1) DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CLASS MEMBERS WHO REGISTERED PRIOR TO 2006 3) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DAMAGES. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 24, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER GRANTING SAFEWAY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ERIC FALSKEN by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 335 Motion in Limine. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER 1) DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CLASS MEMBERS WHO REGISTERED PRIOR TO 2006 3) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO D AMAGES by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 268 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 273 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 276 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 278 Motion to Strike ; denying 280 Motion to Strike ; denying 325 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 251 Motion To Certify For Immediate Appeal Amended Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment to Plaintiff. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 251 MOTION To Certify For Immediate Appeal Amended Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment to Plaintiff filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 26, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE CLASS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 239 Motion To Decertify The Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 260 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL AMENDED ORDER RE PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 7, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE REGARDING OPT OUT RECORDS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2015: # 1 Opt Out Letters 1 of 3, # 2 Opt Out Letters 2 of 3, # 3 Opt Out Letters 3 of 3) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 239 MOTION To Decertify The Class filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 13, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE re 243 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 24, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 223 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 12, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 SCHEDULING ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2015 - 10/13/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 28, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 224 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Safeway Inc. Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 5, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 171 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 203 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Supplemental Briefing Schedule filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: UNCONSCIONABILITY re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 17, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 13, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion to Certify Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER CLARIFYING DATE FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE DOCUMENTS IN THE PUBLIC RECORD re 140 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 2, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER TERMINATING RE-FILED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND VACATING HEARING NOTICED FOR JANUARY 16, 2014 re 124 MOTION to Certify Class Re-filed Pursuant to 10/30/13 Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 5, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second, Revised Stipulation Seeking Extension of Class Certification Briefing Schedule and September 18, 2013 Case Management Conference. Motion due by 9/27/2013. Responses due by 9/27/2013. Replies due by 10/25/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 26, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 10, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Michael Rodman, Motions terminated: 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Michael Rodman.. Signed by Judge 2/22/13 on 2/22/13. (jstlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER VACATING Filing Deadline. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 31, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER. Discovery Hearing set for 11/30/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/8/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 58 STIPULATION to Modify Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/6/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/30/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 46 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 44 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/15/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 18 , 31 Safeway's Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 24 Stipulation Selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENING 20 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodman v. Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rodman
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: P. Craig Cardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?