August 23, 2018 |
Filing
496
ORDER APPROVING JUDGMENT DISTRIBUTION PLAN AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARD by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 478 Motion for Attorney Fees. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
|
December 19, 2017 |
Filing
477
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 476 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Exonerating Bond and Surety filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 19, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing
475
ORDER REGARDING JUDGMENT DISTRIBUTION re 474 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order Regarding Judgment Distribution filed by Michael Rodman. Notice to the Class and Posting of Notice/FAQs t o Case Website: Not later than 12/15/2017. Class Counsel's Motion for Attorney Fees, reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award 1/4/2018. Class Member Objection Deadline 3/2/2018. Class Counsel's Response, and any Response of Safeway t o Any Objection or Other Responses by Class Members 3/16/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
|
October 6, 2016 |
Filing
466
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part 434 Motion for Sanctions. Correction of ECF No. 465. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
|
October 4, 2016 |
Filing
465
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 434 Motion for Sanctions. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
|
July 15, 2016 |
Filing
460
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 458 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 15, 2016. Correction of ECF No. 459. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
|
June 10, 2016 |
Filing
456
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 455 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 10, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing
448
ORDER REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 445 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
|
May 10, 2016 |
Filing
443
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 442 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Plaintiff's Motion For Sanctions filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 10, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
|
April 28, 2016 |
Filing
438
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 437 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
|
March 14, 2016 |
Filing
432
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 431 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Deadlines for Motion for Sanctions filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
|
February 18, 2016 |
Filing
427
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 423 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER -- Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Approving Interim Notice to Class Members filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
|
January 11, 2016 |
Filing
416
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 415 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Approval Of Supersedeas Bond And Stay Of Execution And Enforcement Of Judgment Pending Appeal filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing
414
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 413 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Further Extension Of Stay Of Execution And Enforcement Of Judgment filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing
412
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 411 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER For Extension Of Stay Of Execution And Enforcement Of Judgment And Approval Of Supersedeas Bond Amount filed by Safeway Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 11, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
|
December 7, 2015 |
Filing
409
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 407 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING POST-JUDGMENT DEADLINES filed by Michael Rodman. Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 7, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing
406
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 11/30/2015. (jstlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
|
November 19, 2015 |
Filing
397
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 392 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 19, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing
387
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 386 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
|
October 19, 2015 |
Filing
385
ORDER RE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 384 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 19, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
|
October 14, 2015 |
Filing
383
ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENT SEARCH PROTOCOLS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 14, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
|
October 2, 2015 |
Filing
374
ORDER re 371 Letter filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
|
October 1, 2015 |
Filing
373
ORDER re 371 Letter filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 10/01/2015. (jstlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
|
September 24, 2015 |
Filing
362
ORDER AMENDING PRIOR ORDER re 331 ORDER 1) DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CLASS MEMBERS WHO REGISTERED PRIOR TO 2006 3) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DAMAGES. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 24, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
|
September 11, 2015 |
Filing
354
ORDER GRANTING SAFEWAY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ERIC FALSKEN by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 335 Motion in Limine. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
|
August 31, 2015 |
Filing
331
ORDER 1) DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CLASS MEMBERS WHO REGISTERED PRIOR TO 2006 3) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO D AMAGES by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 268 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 273 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 276 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 278 Motion to Strike ; denying 280 Motion to Strike ; denying 325 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
|
June 22, 2015 |
Filing
281
ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 251 Motion To Certify For Immediate Appeal Amended Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment to Plaintiff. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
|
May 26, 2015 |
Filing
266
ORDER VACATING HEARING re 251 MOTION To Certify For Immediate Appeal Amended Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment to Plaintiff filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 26, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
|
May 14, 2015 |
Filing
264
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE CLASS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 239 Motion To Decertify The Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
|
May 7, 2015 |
Filing
261
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 260 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR IMMEDIATE APPEAL AMENDED ORDER RE PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 7, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
|
April 21, 2015 |
Filing
254
NOTICE REGARDING OPT OUT RECORDS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2015: # 1 Opt Out Letters 1 of 3, # 2 Opt Out Letters 2 of 3, # 3 Opt Out Letters 3 of 3) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
|
April 13, 2015 |
Filing
252
ORDER VACATING HEARING re 239 MOTION To Decertify The Class filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 13, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
|
March 24, 2015 |
Filing
246
ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE re 243 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 24, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
|
February 12, 2015 |
Filing
237
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 223 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 12, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
|
January 28, 2015 |
Filing
233
SCHEDULING ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2015 - 10/13/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 28, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing
225
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 224 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Safeway Inc. Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 5, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
|
December 10, 2014 |
Filing
223
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 171 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
|
December 8, 2014 |
Filing
222
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
|
September 29, 2014 |
Filing
204
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 203 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Supplemental Briefing Schedule filed by Safeway Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
|
September 17, 2014 |
Filing
200
ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: UNCONSCIONABILITY re 171 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 17, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing
169
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 13, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
|
March 10, 2014 |
Filing
163
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion to Certify Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
|
January 2, 2014 |
Filing
143
MINUTE ORDER CLARIFYING DATE FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE DOCUMENTS IN THE PUBLIC RECORD re 140 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 2, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
|
November 5, 2013 |
Filing
125
ORDER TERMINATING RE-FILED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND VACATING HEARING NOTICED FOR JANUARY 16, 2014 re 124 MOTION to Certify Class Re-filed Pursuant to 10/30/13 Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Michael Rodman. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 5, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
|
August 26, 2013 |
Filing
112
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second, Revised Stipulation Seeking Extension of Class Certification Briefing Schedule and September 18, 2013 Case Management Conference. Motion due by 9/27/2013. Responses due by 9/27/2013. Replies due by 10/25/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 26, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
|
April 10, 2013 |
Filing
102
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 10, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
|
March 25, 2013 |
Filing
100
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
|
February 22, 2013 |
Filing
94
ORDER re 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Michael Rodman, Motions terminated: 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Michael Rodman.. Signed by Judge 2/22/13 on 2/22/13. (jstlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
|
January 31, 2013 |
Filing
89
ORDER VACATING Filing Deadline. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 31, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
|
November 8, 2012 |
Filing
70
ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER. Discovery Hearing set for 11/30/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/8/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
|
October 5, 2012 |
Filing
61
ORDER GRANTING 58 STIPULATION to Modify Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
|
August 6, 2012 |
Filing
57
Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/6/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
|
May 30, 2012 |
Filing
52
NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/30/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
|
April 13, 2012 |
Filing
47
ORDER GRANTING 46 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
|
March 15, 2012 |
Filing
45
ORDER GRANTING 44 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/15/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
|
November 1, 2011 |
Filing
38
ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 18 , 31 Safeway's Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
|
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
25
ORDER GRANTING 24 Stipulation Selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
|
September 9, 2011 |
Filing
22
ORDER DENING 20 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
|
July 7, 2011 |
Filing
5
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
|