International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers District 9 Pension Plan et al v. Installation of Data and Telecommunications
Plaintiff: John O'Rourke, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers District 9 Pension Plan, Northern California-Northern Nevada Sound & Communication District No. 9 Health & Welfare Trust Fund and Northern California-Northern Nevada Sound & Communication District No. 9 Apprenticeship & Training Committee
Defendant: Installation of Data and Telecommunications
Case Number: 3:2011cv03063
Filed: June 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF CONTINGENT DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/4/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/19/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 1/18/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/6/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/3/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 5/16/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers District 9 Pension Plan et al v. Installation of Data and Telecommunications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John O'Rourke
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Chloe Isabelle Quail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers District 9 Pension Plan
Represented By: Chloe Isabelle Quail
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California-Northern Nevada Sound & Communication District No. 9 Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Chloe Isabelle Quail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California-Northern Nevada Sound & Communication District No. 9 Apprenticeship & Training Committee
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Chloe Isabelle Quail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Installation of Data and Telecommunications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?