Obmerga et al v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Plaintiff: Filipino N. Obmerga and Lolita C. Obmerga
Defendant: ASC and Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 3:2011cv03151
Filed: June 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/14/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING re 17 Substitution of Attorney filed by Filipino N. Obmerga. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/31/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/4/2011 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/18/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obmerga et al v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filipino N. Obmerga
Represented By: Kenneth Anthony Avelino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lolita C. Obmerga
Represented By: Kenneth Anthony Avelino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?