Huynh v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Phu G. Huynh
Defendant: United States Postal Service and Patrick R. Donahoe
Case Number: 3:2011cv03195
Filed: June 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 76 Motion for Summary Judgment. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re 86 Request filed by Phu G. Huynh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/19/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER re 67 Clarification of Schedule filed by Patrick R. Donahoe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 03/08/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re 43 Request for Modified Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/4/11 (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re Briefing Schedule 40 , 41 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on November 2, 2011. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Setting Hearing and Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss 27 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/31/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huynh v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phu G. Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Melissa K. B. Sladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Represented By: Melissa K. B. Sladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?