July 1, 2016 |
Filing
354
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 337 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 344 Motion for Settlement. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
|
January 15, 2016 |
Filing
335
ORDER GRANTING re 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supp. Decl. ISO Prelim. Approval of Settlement filed by Heather L Newton. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/15/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing
330
ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/30/2015. (emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
|
July 9, 2015 |
Filing
318
ORDER APPROVING CLASS NOTICE by Judge Edward M. Chen 314 Stipulation (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
|
July 1, 2015 |
Filing
315
ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/15. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
|
June 9, 2015 |
Filing
313
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part 309 Motion to Certify Class and Appointing Class Counsel (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
|
May 13, 2015 |
Filing
306
ORDER Denying 287 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Heather L Newton. Motion for class certification/Further CMC remains set for 5/21/15 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/13/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
|
April 24, 2015 |
Filing
297
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/15/2015 09:30 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/1/2015. Reply to Response due 5/8/15. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/23/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
|
April 15, 2015 |
Filing
293
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 291 and referring this matter to Magistrate Judge Spero for consideration of sanctions. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
|
January 15, 2015 |
Filing
271
ORDER REGARDING 02/09/15 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 01/15/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
|
December 16, 2014 |
Filing
267
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 238 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing
261
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 256 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND REPLY BRIEF DEADLINE filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/3/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
|
June 20, 2014 |
Filing
244
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 243 238 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 9/19/2014. Replies due by 10/3/2014. Motion Hearing reset for Tuesday 10/21/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edwar d M. Chen. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/21/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/20/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
|
May 29, 2014 |
Filing
241
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 240 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES filed by Heather L Newton, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 240 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES. Responses due by 7/10/2014. Replies due by 7/24/2014. MSJ Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/29/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing
237
DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 234 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 235 Discovery Letter Brief (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
|
March 12, 2014 |
Filing
229
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 226 Stipulation filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2014. Further Case Management Conference/Class Certification Motion set for 7/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
|
February 27, 2014 |
Filing
223
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 209 210 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
|
February 18, 2014 |
Filing
222
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 219 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 205 Case Management Conference 214 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC Motions due by 4/24/2014. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/18/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
|
December 9, 2013 |
Filing
214
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 213 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 209 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 210 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Heather L Newton, Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC Motions due by 4/10/2014.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/9/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
|
October 10, 2013 |
Filing
204
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 142 143 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 167 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
|
July 19, 2013 |
Filing
193
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 192 Request to Extend Time to Complete Settlement Conference and Reschedule Case Management filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2013. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/10/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/19/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
|
May 20, 2013 |
Filing
162
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 158 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For One-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Class Certification [DE135] filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
|
April 30, 2013 |
Filing
153
Set/Reset Deadlines as to MOTION for Summary Judgment , 142 and (143) and Further CMC reset for 6/27/13 at 1:30 p.m. MOTION to Certify Class (135) reset for 7/18/13 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013) Modified on 4/30/2013 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
|
April 26, 2013 |
Filing
148
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Order Extending Time to File Declarations filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/26/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
|
March 21, 2013 |
Filing
130
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 121 William R. Mitchell's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant American Debt Services, Inc. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
|
March 18, 2013 |
Filing
127
ORDER GRANTING WILLIAM MITCHELL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE re 126 filed by Quality Support Services, LLC, American Debt Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/18/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
|
January 9, 2013 |
Filing
118
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 117 Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC, PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
|
October 3, 2012 |
Filing
114
AMENDED ORDER granting 102 Mitchell's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Quality Support Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/3/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
|
October 2, 2012 |
Filing
113
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 102 William R. Mitchell's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Quality Support Services, LLC. Attorney William Robert Mitchell terminated. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
|
September 27, 2012 |
Filing
112
ORDER ALLOWING WILLIAM MITCHELL TO APPEAR BY PHONE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/27/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
|
August 10, 2012 |
Filing
101
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 100 re 11 Amended Complaint, filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
|
August 2, 2012 |
Filing
99
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 88 Defendants' Motion to Stay (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
|
June 6, 2012 |
Filing
95
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE REPLY re 88 MOTION to Stay filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 88 MOTION to Stay . Replies due by 6/7/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
|
May 17, 2012 |
Filing
90
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTION TO STAY AND CMC TO 7/31/12 AT 1:30 P.M. re 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Motion to stay Hearing reset for 7/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/17/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
|
April 20, 2012 |
Filing
84
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 11 Amended Complaint, filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
|
April 10, 2012 |
Filing
82
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 11 Amended Complaint, filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/10/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
|
March 14, 2012 |
Filing
79
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 RESETTING Case Management Conference filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
|
February 22, 2012 |
Filing
72
ORDER Denying 36 39 Defendants' Motions to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/22/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing
71
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Case Management Conference filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
|
November 22, 2011 |
Filing
43
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Quality Support Services, LLC, American Debt Services, Inc, 36 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC, 42 Stipulation filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
|
November 7, 2011 |
Filing
38
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 35 Stipulation filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/7/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
|
November 4, 2011 |
Filing
34
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 32 Stipulation filed by Rocky Mountain Bank and Trust, Global Client Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
|