In re YAHOO INC. SHAREHOLDERS DERIVATIVE LITIGATION.
Plaintiff: Debra Salzman
Defendant: Carol Bartz, Jerry Yang, Yahoo!, Inc., Roy Bostock, Patti S. Hart, Susan M. James, Vyomesh Joshi, David Kenny, Arthur H. Kern, Brad D. Smith and Gary L. Wilson
Movant: Yahia Tawila and Iron Workers Mid-South Pension Fund
Case Number: 3:2011cv03269
Filed: July 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Plaintiff Yahia Tawila Without Prejudice and Granting Withdrawal of Tawila's Counsel filed by Yahia Tawila. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/21/2015. Attorney Kathleen Ann Herkenhoff terminated. Yahia Tawila terminated. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule, Reopening Case. Amended Consolidated Complaint due by 7/3/2015. Motion(s) to dismiss due by 8/24/2015.Responses due by 10/23/2015. Replies due by 11/20/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Temporarily Deferring Prosecution of this Action re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Temporarily Deferring Prosecution of This Action filed by Jerry Yang, et al. Parties to meet and confer within 14 days of the court's ruling on the class action motion to dismiss in C-11-2732CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/7/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONSOLIDATING THE RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL AND CONCERNING RELATED MATTERS. MASTER DOCKET NO. C-11-3269 CRB.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/6/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER continuing dates in connection with pending motions for appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel re (43 in 3:11-cv-03302-CRB) (31 in 3:11-cv-03269-CRB); (34 in 3:11-cv-03286-CRB), (42 in 3:11-cv-03301-CRB); Set/Reset MOTION to Appoint Lea d Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Replies due by 9/30/2011. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/12/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re YAHOO INC. SHAREHOLDERS DERIVATIVE LITIGATION.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Salzman
Represented By: Kenneth A. Elan
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Bartz
Represented By: Mark R.S. Foster
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Yang
Represented By: Mark R.S. Foster
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo!, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R.S. Foster
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Bostock
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti S. Hart
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. James
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vyomesh Joshi
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kenny
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur H. Kern
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad D. Smith
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L. Wilson
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Yahia Tawila
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Herkenhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Iron Workers Mid-South Pension Fund
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Represented By: Craig Wallace Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?