Lamboy v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Jason Lamboy
Defendant: State of California, Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and California State Prison at San Quentin
Case Number: 3:2011cv03357
Filed: July 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/13/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
October 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 38 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Settlement Conference. Because of the court's unavailability, the settlement conference will take place on November 1, 2012, not October 25, 2012 as previously scheduled. Settlement Conference set for 11/1/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/1/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER, Motions terminated: 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 54 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,, filed by Jason Lamboy.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/11/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/18/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND RETALIATION CLAIM 20 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamboy v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lamboy
Represented By: Manolo Olaso
Represented By: Johnny L. Griffin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Jennifer Perkell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Prison at San Quentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?