Casique v. Lewis
Petitioner: Rafael Diaz Casique
Respondent: Greg Lewis
Case Number: 3:2011cv03449
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 12 . A certificate of appealability will not issue. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/20/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER PERMITTING LENGTHY BRIEFS re 6 . The 43-page "Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Respondent's Answer To The Order To Show Cause" filed on June 22, 2012 is permitted. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/28/2012) Modified on 6/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casique v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rafael Diaz Casique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?