Renn v. Grounds
Petitioner: Anthony Charles Renn
Respondent: R. Grounds
Case Number: 3:2011cv03471
Filed: July 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - CJA 20 Appointment of and Authority to Pay Court Appointed Counsel. Signed by Judge Susan Ilston on 7/11/13. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY;ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL 17 18 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renn v. Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Charles Renn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?