Brewer v. General Nutrition Corporation
Plaintiff: Charles Brewer
Defendant: General Nutrition Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv03587
Filed: July 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: granting in part 398 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 403 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; dismissing the Civil Action with prejudice in accordance with the terms of the Agreement; JUDGMENT. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 372 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7 RE: FURTHER ORDERS ON OUTSTANDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE; DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; DENYING MOTION TO QUASH; RESERVING ON MOTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; ADDITIONAL TRIAL ISSUES. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/1/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 363 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6 REGARDING BRIEFING ON TRIAL SUBPOENA ISSUES AND REIMBURSEMENT DAMAGES CALCULATION. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 358 MOTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF REGARDING LIVE WITNESSES, 355 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpo enas (Local Rule 7-11). Responses due by 1:00PM on Friday, 1/29/2016. Motion Hearing re 355 and 358 set for Monday, 2/1/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne gonzalez Rogers on 1/27/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 356 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5 RE: ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY DESIGNATIONS IN DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/26/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 4 RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers : granting 260 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 261 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 262 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 263 Motion in Limine; granting 264 Motion in Limine; RESERVED 265 Motion in Limine; RESERVED 266 Motion in Limine; denying 267 Motion in Limine; granting 268 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying i n part 269 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 270 Motion in Limine; granting 272 Motion in Limine; RESERVED 273 Motion in Limine; RESERVED 274 Motion in Limine; withdrawing 275 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 276 Motion in Limine (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER by Judge Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JEFFREY S. KANE AND SURVEY EVIDENCE 256 ; DENYING IN PART AND DENYING CONDITIONALLY IN PART MOTION TO DECERTIFY CLASS 257 (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 PRETRIAL ORDER No. 3 Re: Discovery Designations In Dispute (Dkt. No. 304 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalez Rogers on 12/21/2015. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 327 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 RE: TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/16/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER VACATING HEARING.The hearing currently set for November 3, 2015 is VACATED. ***Deadlines terminated. 256 DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. JEFFREY S. KANE, AND THE RELATED SURVEY CONDUCTED BY PLAINTIFFS filed by General Nutrition Corporation, 257 MOTION for Decertification filed by General Nutrition Corporation.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/28/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 250 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 236 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 238 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER RE: HEARING ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS SET FOR AUGUST 11, 2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 08/05/2015. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING AND HEARING; SETTING DEADLINES FOR SUBMISSION OF REVISED CLASS CERTIFICATION AND FLSA DECERTIFICATION NOTICES AND SERVICE THEREOF. Set/Reset Deadlines as to Defendant Summary outlining issues fi led by 5/4/15. Plaintiffs to file summary judgment/summary adjudication motion by 5/19/15; Defendant cross-motion for summary judgment/summary adjudication and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment/Summary Adjudication by 6/9/201 5. Plaintiffs Replies and opposition due by 6/23/2015. Defendant reply filed 6/30/15. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/30/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT PRE-FILING CONFERENCE AND ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pre-filing Conference re summary judgment is set for Wednesday, 4/29/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Case Management Conference currently set for 5/11/2015 is ADVANCED to Wednesday, 4/29/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Updated CMC statement filed by 4/27/15. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/21/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 217 Administrative Motion Re: Class Notices (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/22/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 196 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers administratively terminating 105 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 121 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 172 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARINGS. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 168 MOTION to Decertify the Collective Action , 106 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearings set for 5/13/2014 are CONTINUED to Tuesday, 5/27/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/8/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE JOINT REQUEST TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying 164 Stipulation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2013 is CONTINUED to 9/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/21/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE Case Management Conference/Status Conference set for 4/5/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 5/13/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/3/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 1/28/13 is CONTINUED to 2/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/23/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 58 Motion to Certify Class. The Court's certification of such class is conditional and is for purposes of notification only. Parties to submit joint recommendation by 1/30/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2012 is CONTINUED to 1/28/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/14/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REGARDING PARTIES JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER 39 Letter filed by General Nutrition Corporation, Charles Brewer. Case Management Conference set for June 11, 2012 is CONTINUED to Monday, July 23, 2012 at 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/5/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 36 Proposed Order filed by General Nutrition Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/24/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 4/6/2012. Discovery due by 5/11/2012. Motions due by 7/9/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/25/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. General Nutrition Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Brewer
Represented By: Michael Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Nutrition Corporation
Represented By: Susan L. Germaise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?