Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Centex Homes
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Insurance Co., The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut and St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Defendant: Centex Homes
Case Number: 3:2011cv03638
Filed: July 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 324 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE - CASE SETTLED. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/16/2020. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION, GRANTING REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, AND STAYING TRIALby Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER re (191 in 3:12-cv-00371-CRB) Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney (Jeffrey M. Hayes) filed by Centex Homes, Newmeyer & Dillion, LLP, (104 in 3:13-cv-00088-CRB) Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Centex Homes, Newmeyer & Dillion, LLP, (265 in 3:11-cv-03638-CRB) Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Centex Homes. Attorney Jeffrey Michael Hayes terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/8/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER re (262 in 3:11-cv-03638-CRB) Status Report filed by Centex Homes, (101 in 3:13-cv-00088-CRB) Status Report filed by Centex Homes, Newmeyer & Dillion, LLP, (188 in 3:12-cv-00371-CRB) Status Report filed by Centex Homes, Newmeyer & Dillion, LLP. Cases remain stayed for all purposes. Status Report due by 9/1/2016. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/17/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER, Status Report due by 6/16/2016. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/24/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granted 258 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Case filed by Centex Homes. Status Report due by 5/24/2016. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/28/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER, granting 251 MOTION to Continue Status Conference to March 18, 2016 filed by Centex Homes. Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/11/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER OVERRULLING (236 in 3:11-cv-03638-SC) Objection, filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Insurance Co., St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/8/2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (213) Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:11-cv-03638-SC (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/22/2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER re (231 in 3:11-cv-03638-SC) Statement filed by Centex Homes. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/18/2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (212) Motion to Stay in case 3:11-cv-03638-SC; granting (153) Motion to Stay in case 3:12-cv-00371-SC; granting (67) Motion to Stay in case 3:13-cv-00088-SC (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 204 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 195 Motion for Reconsideration.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 173 Motion for Civil Contempt Sanctions.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Jury Trial set for 2/10/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/30/2013. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 183 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 178 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Strike Exhibit G to Plaintiffs' Motion to Find Centex in Civil Contempt for Failing to Comply with the Court's Order re: Motions to Seal from the Public Record and in its Place, to Deem Exhibit G to have been Filed Under Seal. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 05/14/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: CONSOLIDATION OR STAY OF RELATED CASES. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/25/2013. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 164 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Taking 164 Discovery Letter Brief re Motion to Compel All Versions of Construction Defect File Review Guidelines Under Submission Without Oral Argument.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/14/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 141 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER re 118 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre Motion to Compel Un-Redacted Claim Notes filed by Centex Homes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/25/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER to Submit Documents re 78 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Centex Homes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/07/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 121 Stipulation.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER RE: Summary Judgment Briefing. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/19/12. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 113 Stipulation.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying Motion to Relate Case C-11-3638SC and C-12-0371PJH to C-10-2757CRB. Cases are not related. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/20/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 60 Letter Brief, filed by Centex Homes, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Fidelity & Guaranty Insurance Co., St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/16/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 64 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Setting Discovery Hearing for 7/12/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/1/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 21 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 39 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REGARDING VENUE.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/3/2012. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 5/1/2012.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/23/2012. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 37 Motion for Sanctions.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING PHONE CONFERENCE RE JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER 33 . Conference set for 2/2/2012 at 10:45 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/20/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing hearing on Centrex Homes' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and the Case Management Conference set for 3/30/12 is continued to 5/25/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Notice of Reference and Order Re Discovery Procedures, Denying 28 Motion for Protective Order Without Prejudice. Joint letter due by 01/18/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/04/2012.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 22 Ex Parte Application (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Centex Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Raymond Earl Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity & Guaranty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Raymond Earl Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Raymond Earl Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Raymond Earl Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?