Gomez v. Hedgepeth et al
Plaintiff: David Maurice Gomez
Defendant: A. Hedgepeth, Wilson, Gauch, Kittimongcolporn, Post, Hamlin and Tyler
Case Number: 3:2011cv03784
Filed: August 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Presiding Judge: PSLC KEC
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 12/4/13. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/5/13. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Status Conference set for 7/30/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/16/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/8/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. Motions terminated: 59 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Hamlin, A. Hedgepeth, Wilson, Gauch. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/04/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Hedgepeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Maurice Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hedgepeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kittimongcolporn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?