August 1, 2016 |
Filing
252
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 251 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Franklin Resources Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
|
June 10, 2016 |
Filing
237
AMENDED ORDER continuing certain pretrial dates re 235 Stipulation and Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
|
June 9, 2016 |
Filing
235
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 234 to Continue Certain Pretrial Dates in Light of the Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order filed by John Sender. DENIED. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/9/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing
230
ORDER SEEKING SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/6/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016) Modified on 6/6/2016 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 4, 2016 |
Filing
224
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 223 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Permitting Deposition of Nicole Smith on 6-3-2016 filed by Franklin Resources Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/4/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
|
April 8, 2016 |
Filing
219
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 218 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Discovery Deadlines filed by Franklin Resources Inc.Discovery deadline reset for 5/31/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/8/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
|
March 30, 2016 |
Filing
212
ORDER Overruling 194 Plaintiff's Objection to the February 18, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/30/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
|
March 29, 2016 |
Filing
211
ORDER re Supplemental Briefing on 207 Plaintiff's Objections to March 2, 2016 Order and 210 Plaintiff's Objections to March 9, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/29/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
|
March 8, 2016 |
Filing
198
ORDER re Supplemental Briefing on 194 Plaintiff's Objections to February 18, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/8/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
|
March 2, 2016 |
Filing
191
ORDER RE PARTIES' JOINT LETTER BRIEF OF FEBRUARY 12, 2016 REGARDING ERISA DISCOVERY DISPUTE BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SALLIE KIM 185 Discovery Letter Brief.(sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
|
February 18, 2016 |
Filing
188
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 170 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/18/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
|
January 14, 2016 |
Filing
181
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re 179 Parties' Joint Letter Brief of January 6, 2016 Regarding ERISA Discovery Dispute. (emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing
178
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 176 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 146 Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Franklin Resources Inc Discovery due by 4/30/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/6/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
|
December 23, 2015 |
Filing
168
Notice of Referral for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 12/23/2015. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing
167
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen (1) Granting 150 Plaintiff's Motion to Augment the ERISA Administrative Record; (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part 151 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and (3) Re 162 Joint Discovery Letter. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
|
November 5, 2015 |
Filing
149
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 148 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 146 Case Management Scheduling Order re Adjustment to Briefing Schedule on Motion to be Filed November 5, 2015 filed by John Sender Status Report due by 12/10/2015. Status Conference and motion reset from 12/10/2015 to 12/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/5/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
|
August 19, 2015 |
Filing
138
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by John Sender Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
|
March 14, 2013 |
Filing
121
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion for Summary Judgment; and Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 74 77 113 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
|
November 28, 2012 |
Filing
85
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MOTION HEARING AND CMC FROM 1/17/13 T0 1/24/13 AT 1:30 P.M. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor , San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/11/2012. Replies due by 12/21/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing
58
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 for an Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Reply Brief in support of Motion for Leave to Propound Limited Discovery in Light of Defendant's Inability to Timely File Opposition Memorandum filed by John Sender. Replies due by 7/9/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/3/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
|
November 21, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER RESETTING CMC re 30 Stipulation filed by Franklin Resources Inc Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
|
November 7, 2011 |
Filing
29
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO 10/20/11 ORDER re 28 Stipulation filed by John Sender. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/7/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
|
October 20, 2011 |
Filing
25
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 6 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike Jury Demand; and Denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
|
August 17, 2011 |
Filing
12
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/17/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
|