Grail Semiconductor v. Renesas Electronics America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Grail Semiconductor
Defendant: Renesas Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv03847
Filed: August 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Barbara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER: Re 200 Letter filed by Grail Semiconductor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jospeh C. Spero on 5/6/2014. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 169 Motion to Substitute Party. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014).
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING Telephonic Appearance for James McGuire and Vincent Filardo on 10/4/13 at 1:30 PM for the Motion to Substitute Party. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 10/1/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER for Opposition. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 23, 2013. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING re 162 Letter filed by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., for Brian Bianco and Michael Switzer to appear by phone on 7/26/13 at 1:30 PM.. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/18/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING re 158 Letter filed by Andrew Reibman for Audrey Lo to appear by phone on 6/14/13 at 1:30 PM. Court will initiate the phone call. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/7/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING re 155 Letter filed by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., for Brian Bianco & Mike Switzer to appear by phone on 6/14/13 at 1:30 PM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/5/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING re 149 Letter filed by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., for Brian Bianco to appear by phone on 4/5/13 at 9:30 AM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/27/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING re 132 Letter filed by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., for Brian Bianco and Michael Switzer to appear by phone on 1/18/13 at 1:30 PM for the further case management conference. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/9/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 109 Motion to Stay.(jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER to File Under Seal Court's September 18, 2012 Order Denying Renesas' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 18, 2012. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER/Schedule re 100 Notice (Other) Proposed Schedule filed by Grail Semiconductor. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/9/2013 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 5/6/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed as modified by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/29/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING re 88 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed by Grail Semiconductor To File Its Own Supplemental Brief Opposing Motoin to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/18/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re 64 Joint Letter Re: Discovery, filed by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Grail Semiconductor. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 4, 2012. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING re 61 STIPULATION for Enlargement of Time Pursuant to Local Rules 6-1 and 6-2 filed by Renesas Electronics America, Inc. Amended opposition to Motion to Dismiss due by 3/9/2012 . Amended Reply to Motion to Dismiss due by 3/16/2012 . Signed, AS MODIFIED, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/1/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SCHEDULING ORDER.Amended Replies to Motion to Dismiss due by 2/17/2012. Amended Responses to Motion To Dismiss due by 2/10/2012. Court will decide whether to hold a hearing on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/21/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING re 19 Stipulationto Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/01/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grail Semiconductor v. Renesas Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grail Semiconductor
Represented By: Anna B. Folgers
Represented By: Martin L. Fineman
Represented By: Christopher J. Lee
Represented By: Dean D. Niro
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro
Represented By: Kara L Szpondowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renesas Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Ross Allen
Represented By: Brian Christopher Bianco
Represented By: Alissa R. Misun
Represented By: Michael D. Switzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?