Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Ghermazian et al
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Defendant: Maryam Ghermazian, Morris Cohen and Technology One Online
Case Number: 3:2011cv03882
Filed: August 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATES by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court DENIES the parties' requested proposed order re 20 Stipulation and sets following schedule: Plaintiff's opposition to pending Motion to Dismiss filed by 2/21/12; Defendants reply filed by 2/28/12. Joint Case Management Statement filed by 1/30/12 and chambers binder submitted by 2/21/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 28, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Ghermazian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryam Ghermazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technology One Online
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Drey
Represented By: Annie S. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?