Petru et al v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Anthony Petru and Marcus Mathis
Defendant: Apple, Inc., Hachette Book Group, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers, Inc., Macmillan Publishers, Inc., Penguin Group (USA) Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Miscellaneous: Patsy Diamond
Case Number: 3:2011cv03892
Filed: August 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 46 Motion to Relate Case (C11-4192) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 52 Proposed Order GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 51 EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. HORVATH, JR. IN SUPPORT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES filed byHarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 50 Declaration of RICHARD S. HORVATH, JR. IN SUPPORT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES filed byHarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION to Relate Case filed by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 2, 2011 Filing 48 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
October 31, 2011 Filing 47 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Support of 46 MOTION to Relate Case filed byRebecca L. Rossman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 46 ) (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 31, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Rebecca L. Rossman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 42 Motion to Relate Case (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 20, 2011 Filing 44 Proposed Order re 42 MOTION to Relate Case by Steven Rivers. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 20, 2011 Filing 43 Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of 42 MOTION to Relate Case filed bySteven Rivers. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 20, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Steven Rivers. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RELATING CASES C11-3892 EMC and C11-4500 LB. Motions terminated: 35 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 33 Motion to Relate Case (C11-4754 Key v. Apple) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 39 Declaration of Harry Shulman in Support of 35 MOTION to Relate Case CORRECTION OF DOCKET #36 filed byEugenia Ruane-Gonzales. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales re 35 MOTION to Relate Case (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 37 Proposed Order re 35 MOTION to Relate Case by Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales. (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 36 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 39 . *** Declaration of Harry Shulman in Support of 35 MOTION to Relate Case filed byEugenia Ruane-Gonzales. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Petru complaint), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Ruane-Gonzales complaint))(Related document(s) 35 ) (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 10/4/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2011 Filing 35 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Eugenia Ruane-Gonzales. (Shulman, Harry) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 34 Declaration of Christopher M. Burke in Support of 33 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 and 7-11 filed byKatrina Key. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 33 ) (Burke, Christopher) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 33 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 and 7-11 filed by Katrina Key. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burke, Christopher) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 8 Motion to Relate Case; granting 12 Motion to Relate Case; granting 14 Motion to Relate Case (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Defendants' Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/1/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on Simon & Schuster Inc., c/o Becky DeGeorge, authorized agent of service on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on Penguin Group (USA) Inc., c/o Becky DeGeorge, authorized agent of service on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on Macmillan Publishers Inc., c/o Paul Matthews, managing agent on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on HarperCollins Publishers Inc., c/o Scott Lascala, authorized agent of service on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on Hachette Book Group Inc., c/o Scott Lascalia, authorized agent of service on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover sheet, Summons, order setting initial case management conference and ADR deadlines, notice of assignment of case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for trial, blank Consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge, blank declination to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge and request for reassignment to a US District Judge, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Standing Order and standing order re case management conference, application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Steve W. Berman Pro Hac Vice, 08-10-11 Massachusetts Consumer & Business Protection Act Letter, welcome to the U.S. district court san Francisco division, ECF information handout, and consenting to a Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction in ND Cal brochure served on Apple Inc., c/o Maria Sanchez, authorized agent of service on 8/10/2011, filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTIONS OR OTHER PROCEEDINGS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J)(Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 23 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Support of 22 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Specially Appearing Defendants' Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint filed byMarcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 22 RESPONSE to re 20 Order Plaintiffs' Opposition to Specially Appearing Defendants' Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Penguin Group (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pearson PLC for Penguin Group (USA) Inc.. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Temporary Relief re 16 Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/28/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2011)
August 26, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Raoul Dion Kennedy (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 26, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE OF PENDENCY of Actions or Other Proceedings by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 8/26/2011) Modified on 8/29/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2011 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 26, 2011 Filing 16 Ex Parte Application For The Court To Rule On Administrative Motion On An Expedited Basis, and Motion To Enlarge Time To Respond To Complaint filed by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul M. Eckles, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Proposed Order, # 11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 26, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Reginald David Steer for Defendant Penguin Group (USA) Inc. (Steer, Reginald) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 24, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Anthony Petru. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jade Butman In Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Motion to Relate Cases, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Keller, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 13 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Support of 12 MOTION to Relate Case filed byMarcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Marcus Mathis, Anthony Petru. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Berman) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 19, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Patsy Diamond. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Michael F. Ram, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael F. Ram, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael F. Ram, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ram, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/17/11. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 17, 2011 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 11, 2011 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge & Request for Reassignment to a United States District Court Judge filed Plaintiff by Marcus Mathis & Anthony Petru. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 9, 2011 Filing 4 APPLICATION of Attorney Steve W. Berman for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice -[Filing Fee: $275.00, Receipt Number 4411007417] Filed by Plaintiffs Marcus Mathis & Anthony Petru. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 11/15/2011 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Apple, Inc., Hachette Book Group, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers, Inc., Macmillan Publishers, Inc., Penguin Group (USA) Inc. & Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & Jury Trial Demanded - [Summons Issued] against Apple, Inc., Hachette Book Group, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers, Inc., Macmillan Publishers, Inc., Penguin Group (USA) Inc. & Simon & Schuster, Inc., [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 44611007417] Filed by Plaintiffs Marcus Mathis &Anthony Petru. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petru et al v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Petru
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Stuart McKinley Paynter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Mathis
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Stuart McKinley Paynter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers, Inc.
Represented By: Raoul Dion Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macmillan Publishers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Group (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Reginald David Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Patsy Diamond
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?