Procongps, Inc. v. Star Sensor Technology, LLC., et al.,
Plaintiff: Procongps, Inc.
Defendant: Star Sensor Technology, LLC, Skypatroll, LLC, Tony Rangel and Jim Schumacher
Case Number: 3:2011cv03975
Filed: August 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/27/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 182 195 222 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER RE DISCOVERY 183 191 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER RE: STIPULATION BY PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS JIM SCHUMACHER AND JIM SCHUMACHER LLC TO FILE UNDER SEAL 164 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS 150 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 140 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting substitution of counsel for defendants. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/6/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER RE DISCOVERY 124 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting request of Substitution of Counsel by Kenneth Richard Nielsen. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/22/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW 98 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORY ANSWERS 85 86 87 88 89 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/13/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed on 6/5/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting 59 Motion to Relate Case to C-12-1903 PSG. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting withdrawal of attorney of record re 42 Motion. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011) Modified on 11/30/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING SKYPATROL LEAVE TO AMEND THIRD COUNTERCLAIM (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT SKYPATROL'S REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Procongps, Inc. v. Star Sensor Technology, LLC., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Sensor Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skypatroll, LLC
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Procongps, Inc.
Represented By: Ashwin K Anand
Represented By: Raj Vasant Abhyanker
Represented By: Vandana Balakrishnan
Represented By: Samik Bhattacharyya
Represented By: Christian John Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?