Popko v. Van Acker Construction Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dior Popko
Defendant: Glen Sherman, Van Acker Construction Associates, Inc. and Gary Van Acker
Case Number: 3:2011cv04034
Filed: August 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/11/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2012. Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/6/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation re: Filing of First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit 1 to the parties' stipulation, shall be filed. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/7/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Popko v. Van Acker Construction Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Sherman
Represented By: Michael T Lucey
Represented By: Marie Amelia Trimble
Represented By: Jon C. Yonemitsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Acker Construction Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T Lucey
Represented By: Marie Amelia Trimble
Represented By: Jon C. Yonemitsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Van Acker
Represented By: Michael T Lucey
Represented By: Marie Amelia Trimble
Represented By: Jon C. Yonemitsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dior Popko
Represented By: David Sohn Zelenski
Represented By: Alan Dale Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?