Humboldt Wholesale Inc v. Humboldt Nation Distribution LLC et al
Plaintiff: Humboldt Wholesale Inc
Defendant: Humboldt Nation Distribution LLC and Humboldt Nutrients LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv04144
Filed: August 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Humboldt Wholesale Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 72 to Allow Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint filed by Humboldt Wholesale Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 58 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM re 37 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by Humboldt Wholesale Inc, 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaim filed by Humboldt Nation Distribution LLC, Humboldt Nutrients LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/2/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humboldt Wholesale Inc v. Humboldt Nation Distribution LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humboldt Wholesale Inc
Represented By: Heather Cameron
Represented By: Lisel M. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humboldt Nation Distribution LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humboldt Nutrients LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?