Hegger v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: |
Tami Hegger |
Defendant: |
UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Medela Inc. Long Term Disability Plan and Medela Inc Life Insurance Waiver or Premium Plan |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv04229 |
Filed: |
August 25, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
Santa Clara |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles R. Breyer |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1132 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 9, 2013 |
Filing
76
ORDER DENYING FEE REQUEST, CONFIRMING COSTS, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion for Attorney Fees; finding as moot 74 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
|
March 1, 2013 |
Filing
64
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
|
February 11, 2013 |
Filing
56
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO STRIKE, Motions terminated: 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 53 MOTION to Strike : Defendants' Notice of Motion To Strike and Objection to Plaintiff's Request for Hearing Pursuant to Nolan v. Heald College and Consideration of Extrinsic Evidence to Determine filed by Tami Hegger., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 53 MOTION to Strike : Defendants' Notice of M otion To Strike and Objection to Plaintiff's Request for Hearing Pursuant to Nolan v. Heald College and Consideration of Extrinsic Evidence to Determine, 53 MOTION to Strike : Defendants' Notice of Motion To Strike and Objection t o Plaintiff's Request for Hearing Pursuant to Nolan v. Heald College and Consideration of Extrinsic Evidence to Determine the Standard of Review; Supporting Declar. Responses due by 2/15/2013. Replies due by 2/19/2013. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 11, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
|
January 29, 2013 |
Filing
49
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND SETTING HEARING DATE by Judge Alsup granting 48 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
|
December 14, 2012 |
Filing
45
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
|
November 14, 2012 |
Filing
42
ORDER TERMINATING PENDING MOTIONS (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing
41
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 40 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
|
September 19, 2012 |
Filing
32
ORDER granting 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date; Order filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, et al. re 23 Case Management Conference - Further, Set Motion Hearings. Motion Hearing reset for 11/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/18/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?