Gonzales v. Rick Simons et al
Plaintiff: Jasper Gonzales
Defendant: Rick Simons, Sutter Bay Hospitals and Furtado, Jaspovice & Simons
3rd_party_defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2011cv04319
Filed: August 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on April 9, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/4/2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Settlement. Minors Compromise Hearing set for 3/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/27/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TRINA BOWEN, M.D. AND WEST COUNTY HEALTH CENTERS, INC. WITH PREJUDICE 28 . Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/1/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tdm, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting Defendant/Cross Complainant Sutter Bay Hospitals dba Sutter Medical Center of Santa Rosa's Request for Lead Trial Counsel to be Excused From Appearing At Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/10/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Rick Simons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper Gonzales
Represented By: Thomas Q. Winter
Represented By: Steven Orin Teal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Bay Hospitals
Represented By: Louis Henry DeHaas
Represented By: Troy D. Vahidi
Represented By: Barry Andrew Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furtado, Jaspovice & Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jennifer S Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?