Hickman v. City of Berkeley et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Hickman
Defendant: M. Turner, Douglas Hambleton, E. Bashan and S. Castle
Case Number: 3:2011cv04395
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER REGARDING BINDING ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 2/20/2014. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 93 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jivaka Candappa terminated (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME: set Deadlines as to Responses due by 11/21/2012. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/6/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO WITHDRAW re 93 Notice (Other) filed by Lawrence Hickman. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 26, 2012. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 Stipulation and Order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 17, 2012. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND LAST DAY FOR DISPOSTIVE MOTIONS BY 14 DAYS FROM SEP. 25, 2012 TO OCT. 9, 2012 filed by Douglas Hambleton, City of Berkeley, S. Castle, E. Bashan, M. Turner. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 17, 2012. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending ENE Deadline re 27 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 13, 2012. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation filed by Douglas Hambleton, City of Berkeley, S. Castle, E. Bashan, M. Turner. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/28/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickman v. City of Berkeley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Hambleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Bashan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Hickman
Represented By: Jivaka Candappa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?