Twitter, Inc. v. Twittad, LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Twitter, Inc.
Defendant: Twittad, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv04480
Filed: September 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2011 Filing 7 CONSENT to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re NEED FOR CONSENT OR DECLINATION. Admissions due by 9/30/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 8, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
September 8, 2011 Filing 5 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Trademark Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 4 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Defendant Twitter, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 12/13/2011 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 12/20/2011 at 3:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Twittad, LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment & Cancellation of Trademark from Federal Register & Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Twittad, LLC,[Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611064463] Filed by Plaintiff Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twitter, Inc. v. Twittad, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Represented By: Karen Allison Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twittad, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?