Kumvachirapitag v. Gates et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Sukit Kumvachirapitag
Defendant: Bill Gates, Steve Jobs, Warren Buffet, Supreme Court of the United States, Microsoft Corporations, Apple Corporations, Google Corporations and GE Corporations
Case Number: 3:2011cv04510
Filed: September 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Appeal of Fee Determination Under Equal Access to Justice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2011 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING THIS ACTION TO C 11-4405 JSW; Signed by Judge Jeffrey S White on 9/27/2011. (Attachments: # 1 CertServ)(awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF re 12 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE re certified mail receipts by Sukit Kumvachirapitag (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 10 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Sukit Kumvachirapitag. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF re 8 Sua Sponte Judicial Referral for Purposes of Determining Relationship of Cases (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 8 Sua Sponte Judicial Referral for Purposes of Determining Relationship of Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/21/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF of 6 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/28/2011 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sukit Kumvachirapitag (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sukit Kumvachirapitag. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 2 Declaration of Sukit Kumvachirapitag in Support of 1 Complaint, filed bySukit Kumvachirapitag. (Related document(s) 1 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Apple Corporations, Warren Buffet, GE Corporations, Bill Gates, Google Corporations, Steve Jobs, Microsoft Corporations, Supreme Court of the United States filed by Sukit Kumvachirapitag. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kumvachirapitag v. Gates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sukit Kumvachirapitag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Jobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Buffet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Court of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?