Malico, Inc v. Cooler Master USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Malico, Inc
Defendant: Cooler Master USA Inc and LSI Logic Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv04537
Filed: September 13, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT, GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND FOR SUMAMRY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY DUE TO OBVIOUSNESS, AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY DETERMINATION OF NO DAMAGES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/20/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/20/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ***FILED IN ERROR PLEASE SEE #57***CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/17/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified on 8/20/2012 (cl, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/14/2012. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/6/2012 10:00 AM; Further Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 10/15/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 10/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/23/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malico, Inc v. Cooler Master USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malico, Inc
Represented By: John Whitaker
Represented By: Phillip P. Mann
Represented By: Katharine Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooler Master USA Inc
Represented By: Dariush Ghaffar Adli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Logic Corporation
Represented By: Jane Politz Brandt
Represented By: Aaron Lewis Renfro
Represented By: Bruce Steven Sostek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?