Owens et al v. Bank of America et al
Plaintiff: Joann R. Owens and Larry M. Owens
Defendant: Marix Servicing, LLC, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. and Bank of America
Case Number: 3:2011cv04580
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 148 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Discharging Order to Show Cause. The Order to Show Cause is VACATED and WITHDRAWN. The Clerk is directed to close the file.The 12/17/2013 Hearing date is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Show Cause Response due by 9:00 AM on Monday, 12/16/2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/10/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 136 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/16/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying in part and granting in part 112 Motion to Dismiss; denying in part and granting in part 114 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re 110 Substitute of Attorney and Proposed Order filed by J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp., Marix Servicing, LLC, Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., Attorney Andrew E. Hall and James Michael Hester for J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. added. Attorney Mark Leonard Block and Laurie Hoefert Selkowitz terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/3/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/26/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting with leave to amend 72 Motion to Dismiss; granting with leave to amend 73 Motion to Dismiss; granting with leave to amend 92 Motion to Dismiss (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE OF 10/16/2012 AT 2:00PM. The Court will issue a written decision on the papers. Motions terminated: 106 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Marix Servicing, LLC, Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., 104 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Bank of America, N.A... Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/12/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Laporte on 9/24/12. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND RESETTING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/18/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RESETTING HEARINGS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 8/27/12 is RESET to 11/5/2012 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/5/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To File First Amended Complaint filed by Larry M. Owens, Joann R. Owens, Motions terminated: 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To File First Amended Complaint filed by Larry M. Owens, Joann R. Owens. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/23/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR ADR ASSESSMENT AND VACATING AND RESETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/3/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING AND RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 5/7/12 is VACATED and reset for 8/27/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/26/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND RULE 26 DISCLOSURE DEADLINE by 4/23/12 OF DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS BANK OF AMERICA, MARIX SERVICING, LLC AND J.P. MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP. filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Responsive Pleading and Rule 25 Disclosure Deadline filed by Marix Servicing, LLC. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 3/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline and Rule 26 Deadline of Defendant J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. filed by J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/27/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED ORDER re 44 Stipulation and Order extending time to answer. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/22/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ALLOWING BANK OF AMERICA TO APPEAR BY PHONE re 34 Notice (Other) filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Re 26 Joint Stipulation Vacating 1/6/2012 OSC Re Preliminary Injunction; Extension of Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline; and Posting of Monthly Bond by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/30/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Continuance of the Temporary Restraining Order and the OSC re Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 12/9/2011. Replies due by 12/16/2011. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/6/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/21/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING OSC HEARING re 12 Order on Motion for TRO, 19 Stipulation filed by J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/4/2011 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/29/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence. Supplemental papers shall be filed and served by September 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/27/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 2 Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens et al v. Bank of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marix Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp.
Represented By: Mark Leonard Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann R. Owens
Represented By: Robert F. Kane
Represented By: Shirley Hochhausen
Represented By: Paul Sitner Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry M. Owens
Represented By: Paul Sitner Cohen
Represented By: Shirley Hochhausen
Represented By: Robert F. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?