United States of America v. Approximately $67,391 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $67,391 in United States Currency
Claimant: SANDY DO
Case Number: 3:2011cv04586
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL OF THE INSTANT ACTION.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/28/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 38 Motion for Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER VACATING JUNE 6, 2013 HEARING RE: CLAIMANT'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/30/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 68 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO SUBMIT JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/18/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 36 Stipulation Re: Scheduling. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 34 Stipulation re: Scheduling. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2012 is CONTINUED to 7/23/2012 02:00 PM. Personal appearances are required.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/27/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $67,391 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Patricia Jean Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $67,391 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: SANDY DO
Represented By: James Kenneth Roberts
Represented By: Sharmi Parekh Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?