J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Delgadillo
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Rodolfo Delgadillo
Case Number: 3:2011cv04594
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Rodolfo Delgadillo, J&J Sports Productions, Inc., ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/15/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; AND SETTING HEARING Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/1/2013 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/22/2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/13/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 12/21/2012 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/5/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/02/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER VACATING THE 9/18/2012 HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/13/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; granting 23 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default and Vacate Judgment. The Clerk's Entry of Default, Dkt. No. 14 is VACATED and SET ASIDE. The parties are REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for an Early Settlement Conference to be completed by September 28, 2012.The Court VACATES the hearing set for July 17, 2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Vacating Motion Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/23/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Delgadillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo Delgadillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?