Ocampo et al v. U.S. Bancorp et al
Plaintiff: |
Cesario Ocampo and Aura Ocampo |
Defendant: |
U.S. Bancorp, Wells Fargo Bank N.A, World Savings Bank, FSB and All Persons Claiming by, through, or under such person, or persons, All persons unknown, claiming any legas or equitable right, title, Estate, lein, or interest in real property described in this Comp |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv04646 |
Filed: |
September 19, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
San Mateo |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles R. Breyer |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 28, 2011 |
Filing
18
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/28/2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
|
October 14, 2011 |
Filing
15
ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/14/2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Ocampo et al v. U.S. Bancorp et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Cesario Ocampo |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Aura Ocampo |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A |
Represented By: |
Dean Allen Reeves |
Represented By: |
Robert Arthur Bailey |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB |
Represented By: |
Robert Arthur Bailey |
Represented By: |
Dean Allen Reeves |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: All Persons Claiming by, through, or under such person, or persons, All persons unknown, claiming any legas or equitable right, title, Estate, lein, or interest in real property described in this Comp |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?