June 13, 2016 |
Filing
422
ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTJoint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/13/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
|
May 27, 2016 |
Filing
419
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 27, 2016. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
|
April 11, 2016 |
Filing
417
ORDER GRANTING 416 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/11/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
|
February 12, 2016 |
Filing
408
ORDER RE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL; GRANTING DOCKET NOS. 397 AND 406 AND PROVIDING FINAL OPPORTUNITY FOR DEFENDANTS TO SHOW COMPELLING REASONS RE DOCKET NO 402 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/12/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016) Modified on 2/12/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
|
November 10, 2015 |
Filing
393
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT REPLY EXPERT TESTIMONY; STRIKING DEFENDANTS DAUBERT AND DECERTIFICATION MOTIONS; AND SETTING REVISED SCHEDULE. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland be fore Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing
373
FOURTH ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/20/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
|
July 10, 2015 |
Filing
370
ORDER CONTINUING DATES. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Selection set for 1/27/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Tr ial set for 2/1/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
|
February 10, 2015 |
Filing
300
STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/10/2015. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
|
October 20, 2014 |
Filing
280
ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/20/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
266
ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/16/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
|
July 21, 2014 |
Filing
251
ORDER GRANTING 250 STIPULATION Continuing Case Management Conference and Close of Fact Discovery. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Discovery due by 12/19/2014. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing
249
ORDER GRANTING 247 MOTION fMotion to Set a Date for the Deposition of Plaintiffs' Expert and to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
|
May 29, 2014 |
Filing
240
AMENDED ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/29/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
|
May 28, 2014 |
Filing
239
ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Plaintiffs additional brief due by 6/13/2014. Defendant's response due by 6/25/2014. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/28/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
|
April 8, 2014 |
Filing
237
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 236 STIPULATION Continuing Case Management Conference and Close of Fact Discovery. Discovery due by 9/8/2014. Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/8/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
|
November 25, 2013 |
Filing
209
Amended Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Stipulation re Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/19/2013. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
|
November 22, 2013 |
Filing
208
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TWO DEADLINES IN THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/22/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
|
September 9, 2013 |
Filing
178
ORDER GRANTING 177 Stipulation to Continue Class Certification and Discovery Dates. Discovery due by 4/11/2013. Motions due by 10/28/2013. Responses due by 11/25/2013. Replies due by 12/11/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston for Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
|
August 12, 2013 |
Filing
160
ORDER GRANTING 159 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFF JOE BURWELL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 12, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
|
April 17, 2013 |
Filing
155
ORDER GRANTING 154 STIPULATION RE THE USE OF PREDICTIVE CODING TECHNOLOGY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 17, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
|
March 7, 2013 |
Filing
151
ORDER GRANTING : 150 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFF ALEX WEINSTEIN. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/7/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
|
February 14, 2013 |
Filing
148
ORDER GRANTING 144 STIPULATION RE ESI DISCOVERY PROTOCOL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/14/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
|
February 13, 2013 |
Filing
145
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 141 STIPULATION RE: SCHEDULING ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 01:30 PM. Motion For Class Certification due to be filed by 9/15/2013. Response s due by 10/11/2013. Replies due by 10/25/2013. Hearing on Motion For Class Certification set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/13/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
|
January 24, 2013 |
Filing
133
ORDER GRANTING 132 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 24, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing
126
ORDER GRANTING: 124 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO IMPLEAD THIRD PARTIES, AND SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
|
September 19, 2012 |
Filing
121
ORDER GRANTING 118 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFF CORLEA BURNETT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
|
August 22, 2012 |
Filing
113
ORDER RELATING CASE C-12-4142 DMR TO C-11-4766 JSW. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing
105
ORDER REGARDING AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
|
May 25, 2012 |
Filing
100
ORDER GRANTING 98 STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dairylea Cooperative Inc.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
|
April 17, 2012 |
Filing
90
ORDER Denying Transfer (MDL No. 2340) (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
|
January 31, 2012 |
Filing
84
ORDER GRANTING 80 STIPULATION RE: SHORTENED TIME SCHEDULE FOR DECIDING PLAINITFFS' MOTION TO STAY.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/31/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
|
December 19, 2011 |
Filing
62
ORDER GRANTING (61 in 3:11-cv-04766-JSW) Stipulation TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND COMBINE BRIEFS AND AGGREGATE PAGE LIMITATIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
|
November 28, 2011 |
Filing
56
ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing
29
ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
|