Cabrera et al v. Countrywide Home Loans Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Cabrera and Mila Cabrera
Defendant: Countrywide Financial, FSB, Bank of America, Inc. and Countrywide Home Loans Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv04869
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/9/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 7/12/13 is continued to 9/20/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/8/13., Motions terminated: 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Further Case Management Conference filed by Bank of America, Inc., Mila Cabrera, Countrywide Home Loans Inc., Bac Home Loan Servicing LP, Manuel Cabrera. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 46 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT AN OFFER OF PROOF (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER, 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Filing of a Second Amended Complaint and Defendant's Time to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint filed by Countrywide Home Loans Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/13 is continued to 3/29/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/14/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 33 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Plaintiffs shall have through and including September 19, 2012 to file an opposition to Defendants shall have through and including Octo ber 3, 2012 to file reply in support of the Motion; The hearing on the Motion shall be continued until November 2, 2012; The Case Management Conference shall be continued until November 2, 2012.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/5/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER continuing 6/29/12 conference to 8/24/12. Motions terminated: 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 14 Clerks Notice, Stipulation to 60 Day Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference filed by Bank of America, Inc., Countrywide Financial, FSB, Countrywide Home Loans Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/21/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2012 02:30 PM is continued to 5/4/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/15/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2012 02:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabrera et al v. Countrywide Home Loans Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Financial, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Cabrera
Represented By: Julio J Ramos
Represented By: Steven Margarito Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mila Cabrera
Represented By: Steven Margarito Nunez
Represented By: Julio J Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?