Lam v. General Mills, Inc.

Plaintiff: Annie Lam
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv05056
Filed: October 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/3/13. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/31/2012. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 48 DENYING Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/21/2012. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lam v. General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Lam
Represented By: Stephen Henry Gardner
Represented By: Seema Rattan
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Belinda Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?