Houghtailing v. Frito-Lay North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Houghtailing
Defendant: Frito-Lay North America, Inc. and PepsiCo, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv05062
Filed: October 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Entry of Dismissal re 40 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/08/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Continuance of Entry of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/18/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue entry of dismissal. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/16/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/19/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Deadline for Private ADR session. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/05/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue ADR Deadline. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/17/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Further Case Management Conference re 21 : Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/09/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING re 18 STIPULATION & REQUEST to Continue Joint Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference re-set for 1/30/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/18/2012. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting ADR Process. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/04/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houghtailing v. Frito-Lay North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Wong
Represented By: Tracy Smith Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PepsiCo, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Smith Todd
Represented By: Julie Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Houghtailing
Represented By: James Albert DuCharme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?