United States of America v. Zhong
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jie Zhong
Case Number: 3:2011cv05112
Filed: October 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 79 Motion to Stay of Execution of Judgment and Taxation of Costs Pending Appeal. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/29/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 41 Motion in Limine; denying 42 Motion in Limine; denying 43 Motion in Limine; denying 46 Motion in Limine; denying 47 Motion in Limine (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/22/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ila Casy Deiss
Represented By: Colin A. Kisor
Represented By: Joann M. Swanson
Represented By: Stacey Ilene Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jie Zhong
Represented By: Robert B. Jobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?