ADT Security Services, Inc. v. Security One International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ADT Security Services, Inc.
Defendant: Security One International, Inc., Frank Gardiner, Claudio Hand, Marcos Hand and Thomas Nemeth
Case Number: 3:2011cv05149
Filed: October 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 419 Motion for Attorney Fees. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 418 FURTHER ORDER DENYING CONTEMPT SANCTIONS ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT OF INJUNCTION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying 391 Motion for Order to Show Cause. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 405 and 408 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 411 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY IN CONNECTION WITH ADTS APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE(Re: Dkt. Nos. 377 , 391 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalez Rogers on 7/12/2016. (ygrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER RESETTING HEARING DATES, MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 377 Motion and 391 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt of ADT for Violation of Protective Order. Responses due by 5/18/2016. Replies due by 5/24/2016. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/13/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 10/4/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/24/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 353 TRIAL ORDER NO. 1 re: Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Certain Questions. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 09/16/2013. (ygrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 NOTE: This Amended Order supersedes Docket Number 331 .AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5 Re: Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Stewart and Irwin; Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 11; Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine Nos. 3, 4 and 6. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 09/12/2013. (ygrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2013)
September 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Pretrial Order No. 8 re: Defedants' Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits 15-18. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 09/14/2013. (ygrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 PRETRIAL ORDER NO.7 RE: DISPUTED DISCOVERY EXCERPTS-PARTIAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/13/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 337 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6 RE: TIMING OF OPENING STATEMENTS; PERMISSION FOR EXPERTS TO VIEW TRIAL PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/12/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4 RE DEFENDANTS' NON-EXPERT RELATED MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/9/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ***AMENDED** ORDER re 298 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 297 MOTION Permission to Use Equipment During Trial filed by Security One International, Inc., Claudio Hand. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/6/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/5/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER RE DISCOVERY LETTER (Dkt. No. 281). Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/29/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 SCHEDULING ORDER RE: MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 227 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. David Stewart and Carlyn Irwin . Responses due by 8/16/2013. Replies due by 8/23/2013. Motion Hearing is advanced to 9/3/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/14/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER vacating 8/12/13 compliance hearing. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/8/13. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER RE: TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER CONTINUING CONTEMPT MOTION AND RE-SETTING TRIAL DATE. Court shall hear the Contempt Motion concurrently with the trial is this matter. The Court VACATES the motion hearing set for 7/23/2013. Court Re-sets the trial in this case from 12/9/13 to Monday, 9/16/13. Jury Selection set for 9/16/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 5 day Jury Trial set for 9/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Tuesday, 9/3/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. A pre-trial Compliance Hearing is set for Monday, 8/12/2013 02:01 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/11/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 211 Administrative Motion to Seal (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS granting 204 Motion to Withdraw (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF re 202 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Security One International, Inc., Claudio Hand, ADT Security Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/9/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 199 To Amend the Complaint, filed by Security One International, Inc., ADT Security Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/29/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 158 Motion to Dismiss without Leave to Amend. The Court VACATES the hearing set for February 19, 2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without prejudice 121 Motion for Default Judgment (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS denying 118 Motion for Contempt and Modifying the Preliminary Injunction. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 173 Motion to Appear by Telephone (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER STRIKING SUPPLEMENTARY EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/12/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER REQUIRING DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/11/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER re Motion for Contempt Hearing. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/10/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER REQUIRING PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND STRIKING DISCOVERY LETTERS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/15/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON 118 MOTION for Contempt Against Security One International, Inc. and Claudio Hand filed by ADT Security Services, Inc. and 121 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court by Fees and Costs, Damages, and P ermanent Injunction Against Defendants Scellusaleads and Pure Clar filed by ADT Security Services, Inc. Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/18/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/2/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/22/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Witness List and parties' Available Dates due by 10/26/2012. (ygrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012).
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 131 . Settlement Conference set for 11/29/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/17/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND CONTINUING HEARING DATES, Set/Reset Deadlines : 121 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court by Fees and Costs, Damages, and Permanent Injunction Aga inst Defendants Scellusaleads and Pure Clar, 118 MOTION for Contempt Against Security One International, Inc. and Claudio Hand . Responses due by 10/5/2012. Replies due by 10/12/2012. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The 11/6/2012 hearing date is vacated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/2/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 82 Motion of Claudio Hand to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' LETTER BRIEF CONCERNING CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS re 109 Letter, filed by Security One International, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/27/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 101 Motion to Serve Defendants by Email. (ygrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER re: NOTICE OF PARTIAL PRELIMINARY RULING AND REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN ADVANCE OF THE HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/19/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MODIFIED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR CLAUDIO HAND TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DISMISS; AND CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/21/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' LETTER BRIEF CONCERNING DISCOVERY DISPUTES re 84 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Discovery Disputes filed by ADT Security Services, Inc. The Administrative Motion to file Under Seal, Dkt. No. 88 is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/11/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE DISPUTED DISCOVERY MATERIAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/31/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT FRANK GARDINER WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF ADT SECURITY SERVICES, INC. TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT UNTIL MAY 10, 2012 re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Frank Gardiner w ithout Prejudice and Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff ADT Security Services, Inc. to Amend its Complaint filed by Frank Gardiner, Security One International, Inc., Claudio Hand, ADT Security Services, Inc., Frank Gardiner terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/1/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re 39 Withdrawal of Counsel re Proposed Order, filed by Frank Gardiner, Security One International, Inc., Claudio Hand. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/16/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ENTERING TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT,OR,IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE AS ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss. ECF Docket No. 59 shall be the Order of the Court. The February 28, 2012 hearing on the motion is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS, OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/24/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting hearing re 6 MOTION to Expedite filed by ADT Security Services, Inc., 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ADT Security Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 26, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADT Security Services, Inc. v. Security One International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADT Security Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Goldman
Represented By: Noah Robbins
Represented By: M. Kelly Tillery
Represented By: Harry Paul Weitzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security One International, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Wood Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Gardiner
Represented By: Melissa Wood Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudio Hand
Represented By: Melissa Wood Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcos Hand
Represented By: Melissa Wood Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Nemeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?