Hall v. Comcast Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lynn Hall
Defendant: Comcast Corporation, Comcast of California/Colorado/Texas/Washington, Inc. and Comcast of California/Colorado/Washington I, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv05174
Filed: October 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 55 STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT, DISMISSING INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE, AND DISMISSING CLASS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/31/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/26/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 47 STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/22/2013.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/16/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING re 35 Letter filed by Lynn Hall for brief extension of time to file discovery letter. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/19/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER DENYING re 31 Plaintiff's Discovery Letter Brief filed by Lynn Hall; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that lead trial counsel for both parties shall meet and confer within ten (10) days, from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/4/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 30 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification: Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 27 MODIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting as modified 25 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Hearing on Motion for Class Certification set for 4/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/20/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on January 11, 2012. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Comcast Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Hall
Represented By: Lee Benjamin Szor
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Carolyn H. Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of California/Colorado/Texas/Washington, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of California/Colorado/Washington I, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Katz
Represented By: Rebecca Kim Kimura
Represented By: Gary T. Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?