Larsen et al v. Trader Joe's Company
Plaintiff: Tamar Davis Larsen and Aran Eisenstat
Defendant: Trader Joe's Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv05188
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Because the Parties' settlement resolves all claims that were or could have been asserted in this Action as to all the Parties and Settlement Class Members, Final Judgment is entered as to all Parties and Settlement Class Members and with respect to all claims that were or could havebeen asserted in the Action. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/11/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO FURTHER CONTINUE THE DEADLINE TO SUBMIT THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT re 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. The current deadline to submit the motion for preliminary approval of settlement (09/12/2013) is hereby continued 30 days. The parties should not expect any further extension absent a hearing and showing of good cause. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/11/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue deadline to submit Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. The current deadline to submit the motion for preliminary approval of settlementJuly 29, 2013is hereby continued 45 days. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/24/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION to 6/28/13 filed by Aran Eisenstat. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/12/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY REQUEST (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; VACATING HEARING 52 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER setting Motion for Class Certification March 1, 2013. Opposition to Motion for Class Certification March 29, 2013, Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification April 12, 2013 Hearing on Motion for Class Certification April 26, 2013, Motio ns terminated: 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Administrative Motion for Case Management Order) filed by Aran Eisenstat, Tamar Davis Larsen. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/3/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 42 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER adjusting motion briefing schedule (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/21/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time In Which To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint and Request To Set Briefing Schedule. re 5 Stipulation,filed by Trader Joe's Company. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/16/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larsen et al v. Trader Joe's Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamar Davis Larsen
Represented By: Wyatt A. Lison
Represented By: Joseph N. Kravec, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Braun
Represented By: Janet Lindner Spielberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aran Eisenstat
Represented By: Michael D. Braun
Represented By: Joseph N. Kravec, Jr.
Represented By: Wyatt A. Lison
Represented By: Janet Lindner Spielberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trader Joe's Company
Represented By: Carla Jean Christofferson
Represented By: Randall W. Edwards
Represented By: Kate G Ides
Represented By: Margaret Amalia Moeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?