Marsh et al v. Zaazoom Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amber Kristi Marsh and Stacie Evans
Defendant: Sun First Bank, Jack Henry & Associates, Inc., Automated Electronic Checking, Inc., Data Processing Systems, LLC, First National Bank of Central Texas, Zaazoom Solutions, LLC, Zaza Pay LLC, MultiECom, LLC, Online Resource Center, LLC, Moe Tassoudji, Bill Cuevas and First Bank of Delaware
Case Number: 3:2011cv05226
Filed: October 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND JUDGMENT WITH DEFENDANTS JACK HENRY & ASSOCIATES, INC. AND FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF CENTRAL TEXAS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/17/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER ON MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND JUDGMENT CONCERNING FIRST BANK OF DELAWARE by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 300 Motion to Amend/Correct. Paragrap h 13 of the Final Approval Order is hereby revised to read: "The Court approves the payment of reasonable Settlement Administration Costs to the Settlement Administrator, KCC Class Action Services, in the amount of $115,000." This order does not modify the Final Approval Order in any other way. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF CENTRAL TEXAS AND JACK HENRY & ASSOCIATES, INC. by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 296 Motion for Settlement. The Court sets a Final Approval Hearing on December 17, 2014, at 2 p.m. The Court sets November 10, 2014, as the deadline for filing the final approval motion and the application for the Attorneys' Fee Award. The Court sets December 3, 2014, as the deadline for filing any reply memorandum in further support of final approval of the proposed settlement or the Attorneys' Fee Award application. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND JUDGMENT CONCERNING FIRST BANK OF DELAWARE by Judge William H. Orrick granting 269 Motion for Settlement and 272 Motion for Attorney Fees. The action is dismissed as against First Bank of Deleware only. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 267 Motion to Certify Class. The renewed motion for certification of a nationwide class for the negligence and conversion causes of action, as well as for appointment of class counsel, is DENIED. The case shall proceed with the California class as previously determined. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 214 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL AND DENYING DEFENDANTS JACK HENRY & ASSOCIATES AND FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF CENTRAL TEXAS'S 208 MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS by Judge William H. Orrick. If Marsh wishes to make a renewed motion for certification of a nationwide class or multiple subclasses, within seven days, Marsh shall so notify the Court through a separate notice. Within 45 days thereafter, Marsh may file an amended motion for class certification that addresses the deficiencies identified in this Order. The Motion to Strike Class Allegations is DENIED AS MOOT. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS AND PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 197 Motion for Settlement. The Court preliminarily approves the Parties' class action settlement and Agreement. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFAULT SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED. The Court ORDERS Data Processing Systems to show cause why default and default judgment should not be entered against it. Data Processing Systems shall respond to this Order within 15 days or default shall be entered against it. This Order shall be vacated if counsel appears on behalf of Data Processing Systems within 15 days. The Court further ORDERS that counsel Neil Popovic is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Data Processing Sy stems upon compliance with the provisions of this order directing Popovic (1) to serve a copy of this Order on Data Processing Systems by mail to its last known address and (2) to file a certificate of service within three days from the date below. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/16/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED. The Zaazoom defendants shall respond to this Order within 30 days from the date below or default shall be entered against them. This Order shall be vacated if counsel appe ars on behalf of the Zaazoom defendants within 30 days. The Court further ORDERS the plaintiffs (1) to serve a copy of this Order on the Zaazoom defendants by mail and (2) to file a certificate of service within five days from the date below. (Show Cause Response due by 11/25/2013.) Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/24/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER REGARDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE THEIR UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re 180 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Plaintiffs' deadline to file motion for preliminary approval is extended to 10/24/2013. Parties shall submit a Supplemental Case Management Statement by 10/1/2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/19/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE THEIR UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re 177 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Plaintiffs date to file their Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and all supporting documentation, is extended to September 19, 2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/14/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER REGARDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE THEIR UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT re 175 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 170 Discovery Letter Brief (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 160 Discovery Letter Brief without prejudice; denying 163 Discovery Letter Brief without prejudice. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 161 Stipulation.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 155 Motion Setting Phone Conference (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS re Minutes 149 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/22/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING re 133 STIPULATION Continuing Defendants' Responsive Pleading Date filed by Online Resource Center, LLC, First Bank of Delaware, Automated Electronic Checking, Inc., Stacie Evans, Zaza Pay LLC, MultiECom, LLC, Amber Kristi Marsh, Jack Henry & Associates, Inc., First National Bank of Central Texas, Zaazoom Solutions, LLC, Data Processing Systems, LLC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/20/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 106 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Strike. Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2013 at 2:00pm. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 53 Motion to Dismiss; denying 54 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 14 Motion to dismiss Individual Defendants; 61 is denied. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULINGS AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/24/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING DEFENDANT FIRST BANK OF DELAWARE'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/14/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 49 TO EXTEND DATE FOR FILING REPLY ON BEHALF OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS MOE TASSOUDJI AND BILL CUEVAS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/7/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 45 TO EXTEND DATE FOR FILING REPLY ON BEHALF OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS MOE TASSOUDJI AND BILL CUEVAS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 43 TO SET TIME OF FIRST BANK OF DELAWARE TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/30/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 29 TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS MULTIECOM, LLC AND ONLINE RESOURCE CENTER, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsh et al v. Zaazoom Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun First Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Lyn Davaly Tadlock
Represented By: Richard Martin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automated Electronic Checking, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Adriel Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Data Processing Systems, LLC
Represented By: Meredith Anne Jones-McKeown
Represented By: Neil A. Friedman Popovic
Represented By: Lai Lam Yip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Central Texas
Represented By: Lyn Davaly Tadlock
Represented By: Richard Martin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaazoom Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Dennis Adriel Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaza Pay LLC
Represented By: Dennis Adriel Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MultiECom, LLC
Represented By: Dennis Adriel Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Online Resource Center, LLC
Represented By: Dennis Adriel Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moe Tassoudji
Represented By: Dennis Adriel Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Cuevas
Represented By: Dennis Adriel Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bank of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Kristi Marsh
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Represented By: Henry M. Burgoyne, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Represented By: Henry M. Burgoyne, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?