Sandisk Corporation v. Round Rock Research LLC
Plaintiff: Sandisk Corporation
Defendant: Round Rock Research LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv05243
Filed: October 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 380 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER RE DAUBERT MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/17/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER RE ADDITIONAL MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 323 REGARDING HEARING DATES FOR PENDING MOTIONS. Motions (Dkt. Nos. #123, #141, #272, #286, #314, #317) Hearing set for 4/25/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/24/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER SETTING HEARINGS ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS AND CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 299 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 247 SanDisk's Motion to Compel. (jsclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO DENIAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/10/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER RE: ROUND ROCK RESEARCHS MOTION TO COMPEL (Dkt. No. 243). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/29/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/6/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING DATE FOR CLOSE OF DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING DISCOVERY DATES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 227 MODIFYING DISCOVERY DATES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/5/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING ROUND ROCK PERMISSION TO FILE A CORRECTED AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO SANDISK'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/4/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 5/7/2013. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATES AND REQUIRING FILING OF JOINT SCHEDULING PROPOSAL: Joint scheduling proposal due by 4/30/2013. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/15/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ROUND ROCK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/5/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 118 SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND MARKMAN SCHEDULE. Tutorial Hearing set for 1/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/20/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 101 DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/19/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND AMENDED ORDER RE 93 MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Claim Construction Hearing set for 1/9/2013 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 1/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/11/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/14/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case referred to mediation. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/7/2012 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/5/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE BRIEFING OF PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandisk Corporation v. Round Rock Research LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandisk Corporation
Represented By: Chuck P. Ebertin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Round Rock Research LLC
Represented By: Bradford John Black
Represented By: Andrew Grant Hamill
Represented By: Jon T Hohenthaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?