Symantec Corporation v. Acronis, Inc
Plaintiff: Symantec Corporation
Defendant: Acronis, Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv05310
Filed: November 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 334 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 330 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER conditional dismissal with prejudice filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/21/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 329 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING TRIAL AND TRIAL RELATED DEADLINES; ORDER SETTING CMC for 4/24/14 at 10:30 a.m. re 328 Status Report filed by Acronis International GmbH, Acronis, Inc, OOO Acronis Appellant Brief due by 4/17/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/26/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 327 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 326 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Pre-Trial Dates filed by Acronis International GmbH, Acronis, Inc, OOO Acronis Jury Selection set for 5/9/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 AMENDED ORDER re 294 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/22/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 279 Defendants' Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge's Order of September 25, 2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER re Briefing Schedule for 279 Defendants' Motion for Relief from September 25, 2013, Nondispositive Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/9/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL (Dkt. Nos. 245 & 254). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/25/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 245 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 248 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESCHEDULE EXPERT REPORTS AND CLOSE OF EXPERT DISCOVERY filed by Symantec Corporation Expert Discovery to be completed by 11/8/2013.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/7/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 243 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Fact and Expert Discovery Deadlines filed by Acronis International GmbH, Symantec Corporation, Acronis, Inc, OOO Acronis Fact Discovery due by 7/26/2013.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 218 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to add OOO Acronis as a named defendant filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 177 Defendants' Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 173 Defendants' Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge's Order of December 28, 2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER - Claim Construction Order - Acronis's Patents. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/27/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER RE: DEPOSITIONS OF RUSSIAN WITNESSES (Dkt. Nos. 155, 163). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/8/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER re briefing schedule of 180 MOTION for Relief from the Magistrate Judge's December 28, 2012 Order stipulation to extend briefing schedule filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER re 131 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Symantec Corporation (NOT RELATED). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ESI DISCOVERY PLAN re 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on October 29, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re Number of Terms to Be Construed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/19/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 FURTHER ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS (Dkt. No. 113, 115). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/4/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (Dkt. No. 113). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/27/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 111 to Extend Deadline for the Parties to File Their Responsive and Reply Claim Construction Briefs filed by Symantec Corporation. Opposition due 10/9/12. Reply due 10/22/12. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/8/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (Dkt. No. 96) signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/20/2012 (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 104 to Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Claim Construction Statement filed by Acronis International GmbH, Acronis, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/17/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/13/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 97 to Extend Deadline for Joint Claim Construction Statement (by 8/17/12) filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 92 for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Claim Construction Statements by 7/16/12 filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/10/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 88 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (resolved Motions 86 and 87) filed by Symantec Corporation. Motions terminated: 86 Emergency Discovery Letter BriefDispute Regarding Protective Order and Inspection of Symantec&# 039;s Source Code; Request for Telephonic Conference filed by Acronis International GmbH, Acronis, Inc, 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding protective order filed by Symantec Corporation, 87 MOTION to Continue Claim Construction Dates filed by Acronis International GmbH, Acronis, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/2/2012 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 extending Symantec's time to respond to Acronis's Answer and Counterclaims filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/7/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SYMANTEC'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ADDING ACRONIS INTERNATIONAL AS DEFENDANT AND CONSOLIDATING PATENTS-IN-SUIT IN TO ONE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/9/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF CERTAIN DATES filed by Symantec Corporation Claims Construction Hearing reset for 11/19/2012 02:30 PM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/20/2012 09:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 Order selecting Private ADR by Symantec Corporation filed by Symantec Corporation, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/7/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 21 Stipulation filed by Symantec Corporation, Acronis, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/29/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 19 Stipulation filed by Symantec Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/28/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/14/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symantec Corporation v. Acronis, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symantec Corporation
Represented By: Robert Cleary, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kash
Represented By: David A. Nelson
Represented By: Aaron Perez-Daple
Represented By: Eric Earl Wall
Represented By: Amanda S. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acronis, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?